This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2022 at 10:20:11 (UTC).

Prepared Food Photos, Inc. v. Grubhub Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Prepared Food Photos, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Grubhub Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary M. Rowland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03197

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary M. Rowland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Prepared Food Photos, Inc.

Defendants

Grubhub Inc.

GrubHub Holdings Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joel Benjamin Rothman

Attorney at Sriplaw

21301 Powerline Road, Suite 100

Boca Raton, FL 33433

Adam Grodman

Attorney at Jiangip Llc

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yanling Jiang

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Ste 200

Chicago, IL 60604

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - The Works

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Registration Certificates

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - List of Infringements

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (nsf, ) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc. by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 8/31/22, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On or before 8/31/22, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants GrubHub Holdings Inc., Grubhub Inc. (kra, ) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc. by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (nsf, ) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (emc, ) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (emc, ) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed by Prepared Food Photos, Inc. fka Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc. ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19576257. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - The Works, #2 Exhibit 2 - Registration Certificates, #3 Exhibit 3 - List of Infringements, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRUBHUB INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joel Benjamin Rothman