This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2020 at 09:28:03 (UTC).

Premier Surgical of Wisconsin SC v. edgeMED Healthcare LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 Premier Surgical of Wisconsin SC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against edgeMED Healthcare LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William C Griesbach and William E Duffin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01718

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

William C Griesbach

William E Duffin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Premier Surgical of Wisconsin SC

Defendants

edgeMED healthcare LLC

ABC Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John F Mayer

Attorney at Nash Spindler Grimstad & McCracken LLP

1425 Memorial Dr

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Sean A Bukowski

Attorney at Nash Spindler Grimstad & McCracken LLP

1425 Memorial Dr

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Defendant Attorneys

Kelly J Noyes

Attorney at von Briesen & Roper SC

411 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 1000

Milwaukee, WI 53211

Christopher E Avallone

Attorney at von Briesen & Roper SC

411 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 1000

Milwaukee, WI 53211

Nicholas D Castronovo

Attorney at von Briesen & Roper SC

411 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 1000

Milwaukee, WI 53211

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

#3

2 #2

Exhibit Exh. B to Kurstin Decl in support of Notice of Removal

2 #1

Exhibit Exh. A to Kurstin Decl in support of Notice of Removal

#2

1 #2

Exhibit Exh. 2 to Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit Exh. 1 to Notice of Removal

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 12/30/2019. Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 1/13/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 1/29/2020. Fact Discovery due by 6/15/2020. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/21/2020 at 09:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 888-278-0296 and use access code 8322317# to join the call. (cc: all counsel)(lz)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/30/2019. Deadlines and status conference set. Scheduling order to be entered. (Tape #10:31:00 - 10:35:22 am) (lz)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 12/27/2019, approving #13 Stipulation for a protective order. (cc: all counsel)(mlm)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROPOSED Proposed protective order filed by Premier Surgical of Wisconsin SC. (Mayer, John)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION protective order by Premier Surgical of Wisconsin SC. (Mayer, John)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Premier Surgical of Wisconsin SC. (Mayer, John)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/30/2019 at 10:30 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 888-278-0296 and use access code 8322317# to join the call. A Rule 26(f) report shall be electronically filed with the court no later than 12/23/2019. (cc: all counsel)(lz) (lz).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin for all further proceedings. Judge William C Griesbach no longer assigned to case. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference before Judge Griesbach is removed from the court's calendar. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #9 Witness List filed by Premier Surgical of Wisconsin SC ; Certain discovery documents should not be filed. Please see Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d) for further information. The document has been replaced with a copy of Rule 5. Discovery documents should be served on opposing counsel in paper format; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (cav)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 5 DISCOVERY FILED IN ERROR Witness List by Premier Surgical of Wisconsin SC. (Mayer, John) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/2/2019) (cav). Modified on 12/2/2019 (cav).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by edgeMED Healthcare LLC.(Noyes, Kelly)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE Statement by Premier Surgical of Wisconsin SC. (Mayer, John)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Premier Surgical of Wisconsin SC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mayer, John)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)RULE 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/30/2019 at 10:30 AM in By Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(lh)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #2 Declaration, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by edgeMED Healthcare LLC ; Attachments to documents should be clearly described. This document does not need to be re-filed. The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. For example, if you choose Exhibit from the drop-down list, then you may simply type A in the description text box and Exhibit A will appear on the docket. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the Judge Griesbach's Instructions for Litigants found at www.wied.uscourts.gov(lh)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCase Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (lh)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE Statement by edgeMED healthcare LLC. (Noyes, Kelly)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Ryan Kurstin in Support of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A to Kurstin Decl in support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exh. B to Kurstin Decl in support of Notice of Removal)(Noyes, Kelly)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by edgeMED healthcare LLC from Manitowoc County, Case Number: 19cv434 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3286727) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exh. 2 to Notice of Removal)(Noyes, Kelly)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABC Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean A Bukowski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John F. Mayer