This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 07:41:14 (UTC).

Premier Staff Services, Inc. et al v. World Business Lenders

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Premier Staff Services, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against World Business Lenders. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Arthur J. Tarnow and Anthony P. Patti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13529

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Arthur J. Tarnow

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Olu Victor Longe

Omobolaji Celina Longe

Premier Staff Services, Inc.

Defendant

World Business Lenders

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Darwyn P. Fair

535 Griswold, Suite 111-554

Detroit, MI 48226

Defendant Attorney

Julie B. Teicher

Attorney at Maddin Hauser Roth & Heller, PC

28400 Northwestern Highway, 2Nd Floor

Southfield, MI 48034

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling/Settlement Conference set for 1/6/2020 11:30 AM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit A-Part 2

2 #3

Exhibit B

2 #6

Exhibit E

1 #1

Exhibit A-Part 1

2 #4

Exhibit C

2 #1

Exhibit List

#2

(#2) MOTION to Dismiss , Brief in Support and Certificate of Service by World Business Lenders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Teicher, Julie) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 MOTION to Dismiss , Brief in Support and Certificate of Service by All Plaintiffs. (Fair, Darwyn) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-014238-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7504617 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Part 1, #2 Exhibit A-Part 2, #3 Exhibit B) (Teicher, Julie) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#4

(#4) OBJECTION to #1 Notice of Removal, by All Plaintiffs. (Fair, Darwyn) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 MOTION for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Motion is due 1/20/2020. (Plaintiff's Response to #2 Motion to Dismiss is due 1/27/2020, Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion is due 2/10/2020, Hearing (if necessary) on Motions will be held 3/2/2020 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit B

2 #7

Exhibit F

2 #5

Exhibit D

#7

(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 MOTION for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Motion is due 1/20/2020. (Plaintiff's Response to #2 Motion to Dismiss is due 1/27/2020, Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion is due 2/10/2020, Hearing (if necessary) on Motions will be held 3/2/2020 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow: Status Conference held on 1/6/2020. (MLan) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 MOTION to Dismiss , Brief in Support and Certificate of Service by All Plaintiffs. (Fair, Darwyn) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) OBJECTION to #1 Notice of Removal, by All Plaintiffs. (Fair, Darwyn) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling/Settlement Conference set for 1/6/2020 11:30 AM before District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Dismiss , Brief in Support and Certificate of Service by World Business Lenders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Teicher, Julie) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SOso) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-014238-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7504617 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Part 1, #2 Exhibit A-Part 2, #3 Exhibit B) (Teicher, Julie) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.