This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2022 at 08:29:32 (UTC).

Pregeant et al v. Progressive Property Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 Pregeant filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Progressive Property Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00666

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Pregeant

Anna Pregeant

Defendant

Progressive Property Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sophia Juliana Johnson

Attorney at Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys, LLC

3540 S. I-10 Service Rd. W., Ste. 300

Metairie, LA 70001

Galen M Hair

Attorney at Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys, LLC

3540 S I-10 Service Rd Wsuite 300

Metairie, LA 70001

Defendant Attorneys

LaDonna Grey Schexnyder

Attorney at Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard

9311 Bluebonnet Blvdsuite A

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

Sarah Constant

Attorney at Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard

601 Poydras Streetste 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

Stephen Finley Butterfield

Attorney at Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Rankin & Hubbard

601 Poydras Streetsuite 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Progressive Property Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2364567.), filed by William Pregeant, Anna Pregeant. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons)(Johnson, Sophia) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Attachment Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Progressive Property Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Pregeant, Anna Pregeant. Progressive Property Insurance Company served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Johnson, Sophia) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the chambers of the undersigned at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 1/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/29/2021. (SWE) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#5

(#5) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead to #1 Complaint, by Progressive Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Schexnyder, LaDonna) Modified on 12/8/2021 to edit text (SWE). (Entered: 12/07/2021)

5 #1

Proposed Pleading;

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Property Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent ARX Holding Corporation for Progressive Property Insurance Company.. (Schexnyder, LaDonna) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Progressive Property Insurance Company.(Schexnyder, LaDonna) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#9

(#9) STATUS REPORT by Anna Pregeant, William Pregeant. (Johnson, Sophia) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATUS REPORT by Anna Pregeant, William Pregeant. (Johnson, Sophia) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Progressive Property Insurance Company.(Schexnyder, LaDonna) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. Defendant Progressive Property Insurance Company is extension of time until 1/3/2022 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/10/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Property Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent ARX Holding Corporation for Progressive Property Insurance Company.. (Schexnyder, LaDonna) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead to #1 Complaint, by Progressive Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Schexnyder, LaDonna) Modified on 12/8/2021 to edit text (SWE). (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the chambers of the undersigned at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 1/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/29/2021. (SWE) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Pregeant, Anna Pregeant. Progressive Property Insurance Company served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Johnson, Sophia) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Progressive Property Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Progressive Property Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2364567.), filed by William Pregeant, Anna Pregeant. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons)(Johnson, Sophia) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LaDonna Grey Schexnyder

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Finley Butterfield