This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2022 at 08:03:38 (UTC).

Precour et al v. T-Mobile USA Inc ***Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-3019.***

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 Precour filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against T-Mobile USA Inc Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4 21-md-3019. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian C. Wimes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00907

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Wimes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jack Precour

William Captain Reed

Cesar Lopez

Tomasina Enoch

Marshall P Jones, Jr.

Cornelia Clay Fulghum

Defendant

T-Mobile USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Elisabeth Keller

Attorney at DICELLO LEVITT GUTZLER LLC

Ten N Dearborn St Ste 6Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60602

James Arthur Ulwick

Attorney at DICELLO LEVITT GUTZLER LLC

10 N Dearbor St 6Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60602

Jason T Dennett

Attorney at TOUSLEY BRAIN STEPHENS

1200 Fifth Ave Ste 1700

Seattle, WA 98101

Kaleigh N.B. Powell

Attorney at TOUSLEY BRAIN STEPHENS

1200 Fifth Ave Ste 1700

Seattle, WA 98101

Kim D Stephens

Attorney at TOUSLEY BRAIN STEPHENS

1200 Fifth Ave Ste 1700

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

Kristine McAlister Brown

Attorney at ALSTON & BIRD LLP (GA)

1201 W Peachtree St, One Atlantic Ctr

Atlanta, GA 30309-3432

Kathleen M O'Sullivan

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Lauren Jeffers Tsuji

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Steve Y Koh

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

 

Court Documents

19 #1

*Restricted*

19 #19

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

18 #1

CTO email

18 #18

Main Document

#17

(#17) STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Parties' #16 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#16

(#16) Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#14

(#14) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristine McAlister Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7313515 (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve Y Koh on behalf of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Cynthia Jones on 10/25/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Tomasina Enoch, Cornelia Clay Fulghum, Marshall P Jones, Jr, Cesar Lopez, Jack Precour, William Captain Reed. (Dennett, Jason) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Honorable Thomas S. Zilly transfers the above-captioned case as related to C21-1118 BJR to the Honorable Barbara J. Rothstein. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C21-1415 BJR. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) T-Mobile USA Inc. (ST) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-01118 2:21-cv-01119 2:21-cv-01130 2:21-cv-01137 2:21-cv-01138 2:21-cv-1139 2:21-cv-1148 2:21-cv-01148 2:21-cv-01130 2:21-cv-01153 2:21-cv-01157 2:21-cv-01161 2:21-cv-01169 2:21-cv-01179 2:21-cv-01181 2:21-cv-01183 2:21-cv-01189 2:21-cv-01190 2:21-cv-01208 2-21-cv-01321 2-21-cv-01324, by Plaintiffs Tomasina Enoch, Cornelia Clay Fulghum, Marshall P Jones, Jr, Cesar Lopez, Jack Precour, William Captain Reed. (Dennett, Jason) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-01118, 2:21-cv-01119, 2:21-cv-01130, 2:21-cv-01137, 2:21-cv-01138, 2:21-cv-1139, 2:21-cv-1148, 2:21-cv-01153, 2:21-cv-01157, 2:21-cv-01161, 2:21-cv-01169, 2:21-cv-01179, 2:21-cv-01181, 2:21-cv-01183, 2:21-cv-01189, by Plaintiffs Tomasina Enoch, Cornelia Clay Fulghum, Marshall P. Jones, Jr, Cesar Lopez, Jack Precour, William Captain Reed. (Dennett, Jason) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-01415. (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MDL 3019 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1); in re T-Mobile Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; transferred to the Western District of Missouri; assigned to Judge Wimes. (Attachments: #1 CTO email) (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Parties' #16 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorneys Kathleen M O'Sullivan, Lauren Jeffers Tsuji added for T-Mobile USA Inc; per #12 Notice of Appearance. (MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristine McAlister Brown for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristine McAlister Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7313515 (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve Y Koh on behalf of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James Arthur Ulwick for Plaintiffs Tomasina Enoch, Cornelia Clay Fulghum, Marshall P Jones, Jr, Cesar Lopez, Jack Precour, and William Captain Reed, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James A. Ulwick FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Tomasina Enoch, Cornelia Clay Fulghum, Marshall P Jones, Jr, Cesar Lopez, Jack Precour, William Captain Reed (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7311926 (Stephens, Kim) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Amy E. Keller FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Tomasina Enoch, Cornelia Clay Fulghum, Marshall P Jones, Jr, Cesar Lopez, Jack Precour, William Captain Reed (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7311905 (Stephens, Kim) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Cynthia Jones on 10/25/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Tomasina Enoch, Cornelia Clay Fulghum, Marshall P Jones, Jr, Cesar Lopez, Jack Precour, William Captain Reed. (Dennett, Jason) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Honorable Thomas S. Zilly transfers the above-captioned case as related to C21-1118 BJR to the Honorable Barbara J. Rothstein. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C21-1415 BJR. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) T-Mobile USA Inc. (ST) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketJudge Thomas S. Zilly added. (ST) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-01118 2:21-cv-01119 2:21-cv-01130 2:21-cv-01137 2:21-cv-01138 2:21-cv-1139 2:21-cv-1148 2:21-cv-01148 2:21-cv-01130 2:21-cv-01153 2:21-cv-01157 2:21-cv-01161 2:21-cv-01169 2:21-cv-01179 2:21-cv-01181 2:21-cv-01183 2:21-cv-01189 2:21-cv-01190 2:21-cv-01208 2-21-cv-01321 2-21-cv-01324, by Plaintiffs Tomasina Enoch, Cornelia Clay Fulghum, Marshall P Jones, Jr, Cesar Lopez, Jack Precour, William Captain Reed. (Dennett, Jason) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-01118, 2:21-cv-01119, 2:21-cv-01130, 2:21-cv-01137, 2:21-cv-01138, 2:21-cv-1139, 2:21-cv-1148, 2:21-cv-01153, 2:21-cv-01157, 2:21-cv-01161, 2:21-cv-01169, 2:21-cv-01179, 2:21-cv-01181, 2:21-cv-01183, 2:21-cv-01189, by Plaintiffs Tomasina Enoch, Cornelia Clay Fulghum, Marshall P. Jones, Jr, Cesar Lopez, Jack Precour, William Captain Reed. (Dennett, Jason) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs T-Mobile USA Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7294500), filed by Jack Precour, Cornelia Clay Fulghum, Cesar Lopez, Tomasina Enoch, Marshall P. Jones, Jr, William Captain Reed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dennett, Jason) Modified on 10/21/2021 to update party filing is against (KB). [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren Jeffers Tsuji