This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2023 at 10:03:11 (UTC).

Precision Point Devices LLC v. Huawei Technologies USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 Precision Point Devices LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Huawei Technologies USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sean D. Jordan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-01042

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sean D. Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Precision Point Devices LLC

Defendant

Huawei Technologies USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kirk Anderson

Defendant Attorney

Steven Mark Geiszler

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Precision Point Devices LLC (Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #4 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 2/10/2023. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 2/7/2023. (rpc, ) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/10/2023. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 3/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 1/25/2023. (rpc, ) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Huawei Technologies USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Huawei Technologies Cooperatief U.A. for Huawei Technologies USA, Inc.. (Geiszler, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

4 #3

Text of Proposed Order

4 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Liang Declaration

4 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Qian "Sherry" Liang

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Precision Point Devices LLC (Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/10/2023

Docket(#10) NOTICE: Notice of Dismissal: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this civil case is dismissed without prejudice. The clerk will close and terminate this matter. (ldm) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Precision Point Devices LLC (Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #4 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 2/10/2023. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 2/7/2023. (rpc, ) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Precision Point Devices LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/10/2023. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 3/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 1/25/2023. (rpc, ) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Huawei Technologies USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Huawei Technologies Cooperatief U.A. for Huawei Technologies USA, Inc.. (Geiszler, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Huawei Technologies USA, Inc.. Responses due by 2/3/2023 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Qian "Sherry" Liang, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Liang Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Geiszler, Steven) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022

DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, ) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Precision Point Devices LLC (Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Huawei Technologies USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9266261.), filed by Precision Point Devices LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Kirk) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less