This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2021 at 09:26:36 (UTC).

Precision Drilling Company, L.P. v. Allegiant Energy Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Precision Drilling Company, L P filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Allegiant Energy Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00570

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Precision Drilling Company, L.P.

Defendants

Crum and Forster Insurance Company

Allegiant Energy Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey S. Davis

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP

600 Travis, Suite 4800

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #1 Complaint by Precision Drilling Company, L.P., filed.(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#9

(#9) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Allegiant Energy Services, LLC served on 3/18/2021, answer due 4/8/2021, filed.(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#8

(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Crum and Forster Insurance Company served on 3/3/2021, answer due 3/24/2021, filed.(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#7

(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Allegiant Energy Services, LLC served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021, filed.(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

6 #1

Summons

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ShadiaNash, 4) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#4

(#4) Civil Cover Sheet by Precision Drilling Company, L.P., filed.(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Crum and Forster Insurance Company, filed.(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Allegiant Energy Services, LLC, filed.(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26002354) filed by Precision Drilling Company, L.P..(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #1 Complaint by Precision Drilling Company, L.P., filed.(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Allegiant Energy Services, LLC served on 3/18/2021, answer due 4/8/2021, filed.(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Crum and Forster Insurance Company served on 3/3/2021, answer due 3/24/2021, filed.(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Allegiant Energy Services, LLC served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021, filed.(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ShadiaNash, 4) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Cover Sheet by Precision Drilling Company, L.P., filed.(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Crum and Forster Insurance Company, filed.(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Allegiant Energy Services, LLC, filed.(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26002354) filed by Precision Drilling Company, L.P..(Davis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers is a litigant

Latest cases where Precision Drilling Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey S Davis