This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:11:21 (UTC).

PRATTA v. CIGNA CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 PRATTA filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against CIGNA CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann Marie Donio and Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-17063

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ann Marie Donio

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LISA PRATTA

Defendants

LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA

CIGNA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARC M. ORLOW

Attorney at BEGELMAN & ORLOW, PC

411 Route 70 East, Suite 245

Cherry Hill, NJ 08034

Defendant Attorney

CAITLIN M. STRAUSS

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR, LLP

1500 Market Street, 3800 Centre Square West

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Order Initial Conference set for 11/5/2019 11:30 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/3/2019. (tf, ) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA.(STRAUSS, CAITLIN) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Cigna Corporation and Certain Allegations in Complaint by CIGNA CORPORATION, LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (STRAUSS, CAITLIN) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint. Attorney CAITLIN M. STRAUSS for CIGNA CORPORATION,CAITLIN M. STRAUSS for LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA added. (STRAUSS, CAITLIN) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CIGNA CORPORATION, LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9912335) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LISA PRATTA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ORLOW, MARC) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Initial Conference set for 11/5/2019 11:30 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/3/2019. (tf, ) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA.(STRAUSS, CAITLIN) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Cigna Corporation and Certain Allegations in Complaint by CIGNA CORPORATION, LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (STRAUSS, CAITLIN) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, CIGNA CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/2/2019. (tf, ) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint. Attorney CAITLIN M. STRAUSS for CIGNA CORPORATION,CAITLIN M. STRAUSS for LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA added. (STRAUSS, CAITLIN) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do not select "all plaintiffs" or "all defendants." . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CIGNA CORPORATION, LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9912335) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LISA PRATTA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ORLOW, MARC) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.