This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/02/2021 at 10:12:45 (UTC).

Holly Pratt v. Medtronic Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 Holly Pratt filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Medtronic Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-02523

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

Holly Pratt

Defendants

Medtronic Logistics, LLC

Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co.

Medtronic Inc

Medtronic USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

Laura J Baughman

Attorney at Martin Baughman PLLC

3141 Hood Street, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) CORRECTED WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Holly Pratt. Waiver of Service signed by Lori G. Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#16

(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Holly Pratt. upon Medtronic Logistics, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Lori G. Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#15

(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Holly Pratt. upon Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Lori G. Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Holly Pratt. upon Medtronic USA, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Lori G. Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Holly Pratt. upon Medtronic Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Lori G. Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#12

(#12) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 12/13/2020)

#11

(#11) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Holly Pratt, identifying Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co., Medtronic Logistics, LLC. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

1 #16

Exhibit 16

1 #14

Exhibit 14

1 #13

Exhibit 13

1 #12

Exhibit 12

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29366023 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Holly Pratt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16) (Attorney Laura J Baughman added to party Holly Pratt(pty:bkmov))(Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CORRECTED WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Holly Pratt. Waiver of Service signed by Lori G. Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Holly Pratt. upon Medtronic Logistics, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Lori G. Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Holly Pratt. upon Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Lori G. Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Holly Pratt. upon Medtronic USA, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Lori G. Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Holly Pratt. upon Medtronic Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/23/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Lori G. Cohen. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 12/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Holly Pratt, identifying Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co., Medtronic Logistics, LLC. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co. (ghap) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Medtronic Logistics, LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Medtronic USA, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Medtronic Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Holly Pratt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medtronic USA, Inc., #2 Exhibit Medtronic Logistics, LLC, #3 Exhibit Medtronic Puerto Rico Ops Co.)(Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Holly Pratt. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29366023 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Holly Pratt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16) (Attorney Laura J Baughman added to party Holly Pratt(pty:bkmov))(Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medtronic Logistics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura J Baughman