Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/17/2021 at 07:53:53 (UTC).

Pratt v. LaPorte County of et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 Pratt filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against LaPorte County of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael G Gotsch, Sr and Damon R Leichty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00360

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

Presiding Judge

Damon R Leichty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robert Omar Pratt, Jr

Laporte, IN 46350

Rev. Robert Pratt, Jr

Laporte, IN 46350

Defendants

Robert Hagler

Holt

Allen W Ott

Society

Hahn

Levine

Tchaptichet

Wilcher

Watson

Walker

LaPorte County of

Wilkey

Mary

Hawkins

Minic

John T Boyd

Jail Division

Ketterer

10 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

5 #2

Envelope

5 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Minic, Tchaptichet, Walker, LaPorte County Sheriff, Jennifer, filed by Robert Omar Pratt, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(nae) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#4

(#4) OPINION AND ORDER: The court GRANTS Robert Omar Pratt, Jr. until 6/25/2021, to file an amended complaint; and CAUTIONS Robert Omar Pratt, Jr. if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A without further notice because the current complaint does not state a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 5/25/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER GRANTS #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff, Robert Omar Pratt Jr, IDOC # 143725, LaPorte County Jail # 20990694, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 5/21/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Inmate Trust Fund)(lhc) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Robert Omar Pratt, Jr. (kms) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Alexander, John T Boyd, Elizabeth Darenski, Robert Hagler, Hahn, Harner, Holt, Jail Division, Ketterer, LaPorte County Jail, LaPorte County of, Laporte County Adult Probation, Levine, Mary, Medical Staff, Minic, Allen W Ott, Parcel, Society, Tchaptichet, Walker, Watson, Wilcher, Wilkey, Hawkins, filed by Robert Omar Pratt, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Pratt)(kms) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Minic, Tchaptichet, Walker, LaPorte County Sheriff, Jennifer, filed by Robert Omar Pratt, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(nae) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) OPINION AND ORDER: The court GRANTS Robert Omar Pratt, Jr. until 6/25/2021, to file an amended complaint; and CAUTIONS Robert Omar Pratt, Jr. if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A without further notice because the current complaint does not state a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 5/25/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER GRANTS #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff, Robert Omar Pratt Jr, IDOC # 143725, LaPorte County Jail # 20990694, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 5/21/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Inmate Trust Fund)(lhc) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Robert Omar Pratt, Jr. (kms) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Alexander, John T Boyd, Elizabeth Darenski, Robert Hagler, Hahn, Harner, Holt, Jail Division, Ketterer, LaPorte County Jail, LaPorte County of, Laporte County Adult Probation, Levine, Mary, Medical Staff, Minic, Allen W Ott, Parcel, Society, Tchaptichet, Walker, Watson, Wilcher, Wilkey, Hawkins, filed by Robert Omar Pratt, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Pratt)(kms) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Levine is a litigant

Latest cases where Hahn is a litigant

Latest cases where Wilcher is a litigant

Latest cases where Holt is a litigant