This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2020 at 15:27:06 (UTC).

PRAIRIE BAND POTAWATOMI NATION v. MNUCHIN

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 PRAIRIE BAND POTAWATOMI NATION filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against MNUCHIN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amit P. Mehta. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01491

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amit P. Mehta

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRAIRIE BAND POTAWATOMI NATION

Defendant

STEVEN T. MNUCHIN

Amicus Curiae

MORONGO BAND OF MISSION INDIANS

SNOQUALMIE INDIAN TRIBE

YUROK TRIBE OF THE YUROK

NOTTAWASEPPI HURON BAND OF THE POTAWATOMI

PENOBSCOT NATION

CHEROKEE NATION

GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY

CHICKASAW NATION

AGUA CALIENTE BAND OF CAHUILLA INDIANS

CHOCTAW NATION OF OKLAHOMA

ARAPAHO TRIBE OF THE WIND RIVER RESERVATION

AK-CHIN INDIAN COMMUNITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael G. Rossetti

Attorney at LIPPES MATHIAS WEXLER FRIEDMAN LLP

1900 K Street Nw, Suite 730

Washington, DC 20006

Carol Heckman

Attorney at LIPPES MATHIAS WEXLER FRIEDMAN, LLP

50 Fountain Plaza, Suite 1700, Buffalo

Buffalo, NY 14202

Lee Max Redeye

Attorney at LIPPES MATHIAS WEXLER FRIEDMAN, LLP

50 Fountain Plaza, Suite 1500

Buffalo, NY 14202

James Peter Blenk

Attorney at LIPPES MATHIAS WEXLER FRIEDMAN, LLP

50 Fountain Plaza, Suite 1700, Buffalo

Buffalo, NY 14202

Defendant Attorneys

Jason C. Lynch

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Kuntal Virendra Cholera

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L. St. Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Merrill C. Godfrey

Attorney at AKIN GUMP STRAUSS HAUER & FELD LLP

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Keith M. Harper

Attorney at KILPATRICK TOWNSEND & STOCKTON, LLP

607 14Th Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20005

Catherine F. Munson

Attorney at KILPATRICK TOWNSEND & STOCKTON, LLP

607 14Th Street, Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

31 #1

USCA Order

#31

#30

#29

RESTRICTED

#28

RESTRICTED

#27

#26

#25

#22

3 #4

Text of Proposed Order

3 #3

Declaration James P. Blenk

3 #2

Declaration Lee M. Redeye

3 #1

Declaration Carol E. Heckman

#3

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Notice to Counsel/Party

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MANDATE of USCA as to #26 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by PRAIRIE BAND POTAWATOMI NATION ; USCA Case Number 20-5171. (Attachments: #1 USCA Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PRAIRIE BAND POTAWATOMI NATION (Rossetti, Michael) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) TRANSCRIPT OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on June 11, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-64. Date of Issuance: June 23, 2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the court house at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/14/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2020.(wz) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on June 8, 2020; Page Numbers: 1-16. Date of Issuance: June 23, 2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased fro m the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/14/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2020.(wz) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSCA Case Number 20-5171 for #26 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by PRAIRIE BAND POTAWATOMI NATION. (zrdj) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #26 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (eg) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #22 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by PRAIRIE BAND POTAWATOMI NATION. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-7231120. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Rossetti, Michael) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Max Redeye on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Redeye, Lee) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Motion Hearing held on 6/11/2020 re #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) AMICUS BRIEF by AGUA CALIENTE BAND OF CAHUILLA INDIANS, AK-CHIN INDIAN COMMUNITY, ARAPAHO TRIBE OF THE WIND RIVER RESERVATION, CHEROKEE NATION, CHICKASAW NATION, CHOCTAW NATION OF OKLAHOMA, SNOQUALMIE INDIAN TRIBE, YUROK TRIBE OF THE YUROK. (eg) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER setting a telephonic status conference for today, June 8, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. The courtroom deputy will circulate dial-in information to counsel. Members of the public or media may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/08/2020. (lcapm2) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PRAIRIE BAND POTAWATOMI NATION re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Rossetti, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to STEVEN T. MNUCHIN. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kuntal Virendra Cholera on behalf of All Defendants (Cholera, Kuntal) (Main Document 6 replaced on 6/8/2020) (zeg). (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmc) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PRAIRIE BAND POTAWATOMI NATION. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-1002. (zmc) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Lynch on behalf of STEVEN T. MNUCHIN (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Carol E. Heckman, Lee M. Redeye and James P. Blenk, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7204059. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PRAIRIE BAND POTAWATOMI NATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration Carol E. Heckman, #2 Declaration Lee M. Redeye, #3 Declaration James P. Blenk, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Rossetti, Michael) Modified on 6/8/2020 (zeg). Modified on 6/10/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PRAIRIE BAND POTAWATOMI NATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael G. Rossetti, #2 Exhibit Rossetti Declaration-Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Rossetti Declaration-Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Rossetti Declaration-Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Rossetti Declaration-Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Rossetti Declaration-Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Rossetti Declaration-Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Rossetti Declaration-Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Rossetti Declaration-Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Rossetti Declaration-Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Rossetti Declaration-Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Rossetti Declaration-Exhibit K, #13 Declaration Joseph P. Rupnick, #14 Exhibit Rupnick Declaration-Exhibit A, #15 Exhibit Rupnick Declaration-Exhibit B, #16 Declaration Eric C. Henson, #17 Exhibit Henson Declaration-Exhibit 1, #18 Exhibit Henson Declaration-Exhibit 2, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Rossetti, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PRAIRIE BAND POTAWATOMI NATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7203772) filed by PRAIRIE BAND POTAWATOMI NATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice to Counsel/Party, #3 Summons)(Rossetti, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ak-Chin Indian Community is a litigant

Latest cases where CHOCTAW NATION OF OKLAHOMA is a litigant

Latest cases where GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Nottawaseppi Huron Band of Potawatomi Indians is a litigant