This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2020 at 08:56:18 (UTC).

Prado v. Baxter Healthcare Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Prado filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Baxter Healthcare Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II and Jared M. Strauss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-61804

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II

Referral Judge

Jared M. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Camilo Prado

Defendant

Baxter Healthcare Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

G Ware Cornell, Jr.

Attorney at Cornell & Associates

2645 Executive Park Dr.

Weston, FL 33331

Defendant Attorneys

David M. DeMaio

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

9130 S. Dadeland Blvd, Suite 1625

Miami, FL 33156

Gregory Robert Hawran

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

9130 S. Dadeland Boulevard, Suite 1625

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 10/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (emd) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 8/30/2021 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Calendar Call set for 8/24/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Amended Pleadings due by 12/2/2020., Discovery due by 5/4/2021., Expert Discovery due by 5/4/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 12/2/2020., Mediation Deadline 5/11/2021., In Limine Motions due by 6/15/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 5/18/2021., Motions due by 5/18/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/15/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 5/11/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#8

(#8) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baxter Healthcare Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Baxter International Inc. for Baxter Healthcare Corporation (Hawran, Gregory) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Baxter Healthcare Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hawran, Gregory) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#6

(#6) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Camilo Prado (Cornell, G) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#5

(#5) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/19/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (as03) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#4

(#4) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Baxter Healthcare Corporation. Attorney Gregory Robert Hawran added to party Baxter Healthcare Corporation(pty:dft). (Hawran, Gregory) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Baxter Healthcare Corporation. (drz) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Baxter Healthcare Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13463621, filed by Camilo Prado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Cornell, G) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 10/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (emd) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 8/30/2021 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Calendar Call set for 8/24/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Amended Pleadings due by 12/2/2020., Discovery due by 5/4/2021., Expert Discovery due by 5/4/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 12/2/2020., Mediation Deadline 5/11/2021., In Limine Motions due by 6/15/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 5/18/2021., Motions due by 5/18/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/15/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 5/11/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (jao) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baxter Healthcare Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Baxter International Inc. for Baxter Healthcare Corporation (Hawran, Gregory) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Baxter Healthcare Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hawran, Gregory) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Camilo Prado (Cornell, G) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/19/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (as03) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Baxter Healthcare Corporation. Attorney Gregory Robert Hawran added to party Baxter Healthcare Corporation(pty:dft). (Hawran, Gregory) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Baxter Healthcare Corporation. (drz) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Baxter Healthcare Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13463621, filed by Camilo Prado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Cornell, G) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Baxter Healthcare Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory Robert Hawran

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M. DeMaio