This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2020 at 08:28:54 (UTC).

PR SM Capri, LLC v. Luis Urioste et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 PR SM Capri, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Luis Urioste. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01659

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PR SM Capri, LLC

Defendants

Luis Urioste

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Does 1 to 10 inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Linda Tracey Hollenbeck

Attorney at Hollenbeck and Cardoso LLP

444 West Ocean Boulevard Suite 705

Long Beach, CA 90802

Tania Kim Cardoso

Attorney at Hollenbeck and Cardoso LLP

444 West Ocean Boulevard Suite 705

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#8

(#8) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Santa Monica Courthouse. Case number: 19SMUD02305. (jp) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to the Superior Court of California for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Made JS-6 Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge R. Gary Klausner that the request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 is hereby DENIED. IT IS RECOMMENDED by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for the following reasons: (1) District Court lacks jurisdiction. (2) Improperly removed unlawful detainer action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby REMANDED to State Court. (jp) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Luis Urioste. (lh) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Luis Urioste, (lh) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, case number 19SMUD02305 with copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Filed by Defendant Luis Urioste. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Santa Monica Courthouse. Case number: 19SMUD02305. (jp) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to the Superior Court of California for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Made JS-6 Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge R. Gary Klausner that the request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 is hereby DENIED. IT IS RECOMMENDED by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for the following reasons: (1) District Court lacks jurisdiction. (2) Improperly removed unlawful detainer action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby REMANDED to State Court. (jp) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Luis Urioste. (lh) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Luis Urioste, (lh) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, case number 19SMUD02305 with copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Filed by Defendant Luis Urioste. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tania Kim Cardoso