This case was last updated from PACER on 11/05/2019 at 07:59:44 (UTC).

Poydras v. Iberia Bank Corp

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 Poydras filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Iberia Bank Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J Hanna and James D Cain, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-01171

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patrick J Hanna

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quonzel Poydras

Lafayette, LA 70501

Defendants

Iberia Bank Corp

Iberiabank Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Minia Elizabeth Bremenstul

Attorney at Jones Walker (NO)

201 St Charles Ave Ste 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Tracy E Kern

Attorney at Jones Walker (NO)

201 St Charles Ave Ste 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 11/27/2019 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#12

(#12) PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Iberiabank Corp re #10 Motion to Dismiss,, Motion to Compel,. (aty,Bremenstul, Minia) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Iberia Bank Corp. (aty,Bremenstul, Minia) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

10 #3

Exhibit B - Declaration of Donna Domec

10 #2

Exhibit A - Declaration of Maria Manuel

10 #1

Memorandum / Brief

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Iberiabank Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Maria Manuel, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Donna Domec)(Attorney Minia Elizabeth Bremenstul added to party Iberia Bank Corp(pty:dft))(aty,Bremenstul, Minia) Modified on 10/11/2019 to modify filer and indicate #12 Proposed Order submitted as separate document. (Crick, S). (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quonzel Poydras. Iberia Bank Corp served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Iberia Bank Corp. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/17/2019. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#4

(#4) CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled First Page of Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Quonzel Poydras. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Deficiency to Quonzel Poydras regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Reason: Incomplete IFP application. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#2

(#3) NOTICE of Deficiency to Quonzel Poydras regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Reason: Incomplete IFP application. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

No Description Available

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. Motion day set for 11/27/2019 before Judge James D Cain Jr. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Iberiabank Corp re #10 Motion to Dismiss,, Motion to Compel,. (aty,Bremenstul, Minia) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motions Transferred regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motions referred to Judge James D Cain, Jr. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Iberia Bank Corp. (aty,Bremenstul, Minia) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Iberiabank Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Maria Manuel, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Donna Domec)(Attorney Minia Elizabeth Bremenstul added to party Iberia Bank Corp(pty:dft))(aty,Bremenstul, Minia) Modified on 10/11/2019 to modify filer and indicate #12 Proposed Order submitted as separate document. (Crick, S). (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • (#8) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/1/2019. (crt,Nations, S) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quonzel Poydras. Iberia Bank Corp served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Iberia Bank Corp. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/17/2019. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PROPOSED ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled First Page of Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Quonzel Poydras. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Deficiency to Quonzel Poydras regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Reason: Incomplete IFP application. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Iberia Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where IBERIABANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Minia E. Bremenstul

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tracy E Kern(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)