This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/23/2021 at 08:36:33 (UTC).

Appanoose County et al v. Allergan PLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 Appanoose County filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Allergan PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Celeste F. Bremer and John A. Jarvey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00095

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Celeste F. Bremer

Presiding Judge

John A. Jarvey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hancock County

Cerro Gordo County

Keokuk County, Iowa

Winnebago County

Defendants

Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Allergan Sales, LLC

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Anda, Inc.

Sandoz, Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Actavis Elizabeth, LLC

KVK Tech., Inc.

Actavis South Atlantic, LLC

WSE Management, LLC

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC

WSE Investment, LLC

69 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas J. Mauro

Attorney at CARNEY & APPLEBY PLC

303 Locust St, 400 Homestead Bldg

Des Moines, IA 50309

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. File electronically sent to the Northern District of Ohio. (don) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certified Conditional Transfer Order 190 by clerk's office for the Northern District of Ohio. (don) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-190) re: pldg. ( in IAS/4:21-cv-00095, 9061 in MDL No. 2804) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 4/13/2021.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, IAS/4:21-cv-00095 (don) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#3) TEXT MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-190) Finalized on 4/13/21. Please see pleading (3 in IAS/4:21-cv-00095As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. Ohio for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 4/13/2021.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, IAS/4:21-cv-00095, MSS/2:21-cv-00044 (SM) (don) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter to MDL Panel Potential Tag-Along Action. Letter and paperwork emailed to MDL. (slg) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4437127., filed by Hancock County, Wright County, Webster County, Jones County, Keokuk County, Iowa, Madison County, Pocahontas County, Appanoose County, Winnebago County, Poweshiek County, Osceola County, Muscatine County, Fremont County, Iowa, Cerro Gordo County, Ida County, Henry County, Iowa, Cherokee County, Emmet County, Iowa. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 6/22/2021. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/22/2021.(Mauro, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cerro Gordo County is a litigant

Latest cases where HANCOCK COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where Winnebago County is a litigant

Latest cases where WSE Investment, LLC is a litigant