This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2020 at 09:38:55 (UTC).

POWERS v. SPARTANNASH ASSOCIATES, LLC.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 POWERS filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against SPARTANNASH ASSOCIATES, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02414

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIMOTHY POWERS

Defendant

SPARTANNASH ASSOCIATES, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darron S. Stewart

Attorney at STEWART & STEWART

931 South Rangeline Road

Carmel, IN 46032

Tiffany Ruth Guthrie

Attorney at STEWART & STEWART

931 S. Rangeline Road

Carmel, IN 46032

Defendant Attorney

Suzanne S. Newcomb

Attorney at SMITHAMUNDSEN LLC (Indianapolis)

201 North Illinois Street, Suite 1400, Capital Center, South Tower

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPARTANNASH ASSOCIATES, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent SpartanNash Company for SPARTANNASH ASSOCIATES, LLC... (Newcomb, Suzanne) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by SPARTANNASH ASSOCIATES, LLC..(Newcomb, Suzanne) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne S. Newcomb on behalf of Defendant SPARTANNASH ASSOCIATES, LLC.. (Newcomb, Suzanne) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#6

(#6) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to SPARTANNASH ASSOCIATES, LLC.. (AKH) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Darron S. Stewart on behalf of Plaintiff TIMOTHY POWERS. (Stewart, Darron) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Ruth Guthrie on behalf of Plaintiff TIMOTHY POWERS. (Guthrie, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1_Dismissal & Notice of Rights

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against SPARTANNASH ASSOCIATES, LLC., filed by TIMOTHY POWERS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6184771) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_Dismissal & Notice of Rights, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Guthrie, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPARTANNASH ASSOCIATES, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent SpartanNash Company for SPARTANNASH ASSOCIATES, LLC... (Newcomb, Suzanne) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by SPARTANNASH ASSOCIATES, LLC..(Newcomb, Suzanne) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne S. Newcomb on behalf of Defendant SPARTANNASH ASSOCIATES, LLC.. (Newcomb, Suzanne) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to SPARTANNASH ASSOCIATES, LLC.. (AKH) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Darron S. Stewart on behalf of Plaintiff TIMOTHY POWERS. (Stewart, Darron) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Ruth Guthrie on behalf of Plaintiff TIMOTHY POWERS. (Guthrie, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against SPARTANNASH ASSOCIATES, LLC., filed by TIMOTHY POWERS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6184771) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_Dismissal & Notice of Rights, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Guthrie, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less