This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2019 at 08:51:56 (UTC).

Powers v. Arroyo et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 Powers filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Arroyo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joe Billy McDade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04189

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joe Billy McDade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Powers

Rushville, IL 62681

Defendants

Kimberly Weitl

John Arroyo

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Letter from Clerk of Court to Rushville TDF Trust Fund Dept requesting ledgers 3/30/19 through 9/30/19. Emailed to Rushville TDF. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Status by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 10/30/2019 (JRK, ilcd) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#5

(#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 10/15/2019 (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 10/15/2019 (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Joe Billy McDade. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria,IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Review Complaint by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 11/5/2019 (TK, ilcd) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas Powers.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Review Complaint by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 11/5/2019 (TK, ilcd) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 10/17/2019. On 9/30/2019 Plaintiff filed a complaint and petition to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") #3 . Plaintiff had previously filed a series of IFP petitions in other cases which were denied due to his "long-standing history of dissipating funds prior to filing suit, and then claiming poverty and requesting a waiver of the partial filing fee." Powers v. Scott, No. 19-4093 (C.D.Ill. Aug. 7, 2019); Powers v. Caraway, No. 19-4117 (C.D.Ill Aug. 6, 2019); Powers v. Hou, No. 19-4119 (C.D.Ill. Aug. 7, 2019); Powers v. Wilcoxen, No. 19-4090. On 7/22/19, the Court in Powers v. Wilcoxen, ordered that Plaintiff disclose all outstanding filing fees in any subsequent lawsuit. Plaintiff's complaint here was filed several months later and violates that court order as it does not disclose the numerous filing fees which he owes. Furthermore, on October 15, 2019, the Seventh Circuit entered an order under Support Sys. Int'l, Inc. V. Mack, 45 F.3d 185, finding that Plaintiff had "forfeited the privilege of proceeding in forma pauperis in any new or pending case or appeal until he has paid, in full, all outstanding fees and costs for all of his lawsuits." Powers v. Wilcoxen, No. 19-2478 (7th Cir. Oct. 15, 2019). Accordingly, #3 is DENIED. Plaintiff will have 21 days in which to pay the $400 filing fee. The failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice. All pending motions are rendered MOOT with leave to reassert after payment of the filing fee.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Status by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 10/30/2019 (JRK, ilcd) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 10/15/2019 (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from Clerk of Court to Rushville TDF Trust Fund Dept requesting ledgers 3/30/19 through 9/30/19. Emailed to Rushville TDF. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Thomas Powers. Responses due by 10/15/2019 (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Joe Billy McDade. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria,IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas Powers.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.