This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/07/2020 at 08:12:44 (UTC).

Power Mangement Controls, LLC v. 5Nickles, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2020 Power Mangement Controls, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 5Nickles, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey V Brown and Andrew M Edison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00154

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey V Brown

Referral Judge

Andrew M Edison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Power Mangement Controls, LLC

4511Yoakum Blvd. Suite 200

Houston, TX 77006

Defendants

E3 Pumping Solutions, LLC

John Lesnick

5Nickles, Inc.

Andrew Lesnick

Scott Cline

L5 Group, Inc.

Alice Lesnick

E3P Solutions LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas Michael Brown

Attorney at Fulkerson Lotz LLP

4511 Yoakum Blvd, Ste 200

Houston, TX 77006

Wesley Graham Lotz

Attorney at Fulkerson Lotz LLP

4511 Yoakum Blvd., Suite 200

Houston, TX 77006-5821

Nick Brown

Attorney at Fulkerson Lotz LLP

4511 Yoakum Blvd, Suite 200

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorneys

Gary E. Alfred

Attorney at Kean Miller

711 Louisiana, Suite 1800

Houston, TX 77002

David Miller Medearis

Attorney at Sullins Johnston Rohrbach and Magers

3200 Southwest Freeway, Ste 2200

Houston, TX 77027

Jonathan E. Daigle

Attorney at Sullins Johnston et al

2200 Phoenix Tower, 3200 Southwest Fwy

Houston, TX 77027

James Matthew Hall, Jr.

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP

711 Louisiana Street, Ste 1800

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

#18

17 #2

Proposed Order

17 #1

Letter Motion

#17

16 #2

Case2

3 #1

Exhibit 1

#2

1 #6

Errata F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 MOTION to Remand. Objections to M&R due by 7/9/2020(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Submission of E3 Pumping Solutions, LLC's Motion to DismissMotions referred to Andrew M Edison. by Power Mangement Controls, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Letter on Defendants' Request for Additional Briefing by Power Mangement Controls, LLC, filed.(Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Leave to File to File Letter ResponseMotions referred to Andrew M Edison. by 5Nickles, Inc., L5 Group, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Letter Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Medearis, David Miller) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) BRIEF Opposition Surreply re: #10 Reply by Scott Cline, E3 Pumping Solutions, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Case1, #2 Case2)(Alfred, Gary) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Second BRIEF Opposition Surreply re: #10 Reply by Scott Cline, E3 Pumping Solutions, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Case 1, #6 Case 2)(Alfred, Gary) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First BRIEF Opposition Surreply re: #10 Reply by Scott Cline, E3 Pumping Solutions, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Alfred, Gary) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Response to Motion to Remand by Scott Cline and E3 Pumping Solutions, LLC, filed. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison. Motion hearing held on June 8, 2020, as to [Dkt. 3] Brief (Letter Brief). The motion will be taken under advisement. Appearances: Nicholas Brown for the plaintiff; David Medearis for the defendant 5Nickles, Inc., John Lesnick, Andrew Lesnick, Alice Lesnick, and L5 Group, Inc.; Gary Alfred for defendant Scott Cline, E3 Pumping Solutions, LLC, and E3P Solutions LLC. (Court Reporter: L. Wells), filed. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY in Support of Motion to Remand, filed by Power Mangement Controls, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to File Letter ResponseMotions referred to Andrew M Edison. by E3 Pumping Solutions, LLC, E3P Solutions LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Letter Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Alfred, Gary) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE to #3 Brief Motion to Remand, filed by L5 Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Medearis, David Miller) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE to #3 Brief Motion to Remand, filed by Scott Cline, E3 Pumping Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Alfred, Gary) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT to Removal by Scott Cline, E3 Pumping Solutions, LLC, filed.(Alfred, Gary) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Defendant's Responses due by 6/3/2020. Plaintiff's Replies due by 6/5/2020 Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEF (LETTER BRIEF) by Power Mangement Controls, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Errata 3)(Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 56th District Court of Galveston, case number 18-CV-1164 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24641992) filed by L5 Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Errata F)(Medearis, David Miller) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Miller Medearis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Matthew Hall, Jr.