This case was last updated from PACER on 01/09/2020 at 05:45:37 (UTC).

Power Investments, LLC v. SL EC, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 Power Investments, LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against SL EC, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John A. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00028

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Power Investments, LLC

Defendants

SL EC LLC

Michael F. Becker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Robinson Smith

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson, PLLC - Lexington

One Paragon Centre, 2525 Harrodsburg Road, Suite 300

Lexington, KY 40504

Carl D. Edwards, Jr.

Attorney at Miller Edwards Rambicure PLLC - Lexington

300 E. Main Street, Suite 360

Lexington, KY 40507

Defendant Attorneys

William H. Mooney

Attorney at Lynch, Cox, Gilman & Goodman P.S.C.

500 W. Jefferson Street, Suite 2100

Louisville, KY 40202

Robert L. Brown

Attorney at Lynch, Cox, Gilman & Goodman P.S.C.

500 W. Jefferson Street, Suite 2100

Louisville, KY 40202

Dylan R. Maschmeyer

Attorney at Lynch, Cox, Gilman & Goodman P.S.C.

500 W. Jefferson Street, Suite 2100

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

State Court Record

#1

(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, William Mooney. #1 Notice of Removal has been filed by SL EC, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (STC) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#32

(#32) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Fayette Circuit Court, filed by Power Investments, LLC.(MRC) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, William Mooney. #1 Notice of Removal has been filed by SL EC, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (STC) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Robert L. Brown by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (STC) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Dylan Maschmeyer by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (STC) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENTPURSUANT TO FED. R.CIV. P.71 by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC. (Mooney, William) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

7 #6

Exhibit EXHIBIT E - SL EC Sec of State Return

#31

(#31) Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 5:18-cv-00466. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (Entered: 01/08/2020)

31 #1

*Restricted*

29 #1

Proposed Order -Agreed Order of Transfer

#29

(#29) JOINT MOTION to Change Venue by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order -Agreed Order of Transfer)(Mooney, William) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#30

(#30) ORDER: 1. Parties' #29 JOINT MOTION to Change Venue is GRANTED. 2. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this matter to the Eastern District of Missouri, Eastern Division. 3. All further filings in this case shall be filed with that Court. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/7/2019.(JJ)cc: COR (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#28

(#28) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Memorandum and Order)(Mooney, William) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

28 #1

Exhibit A- Memorandum and Order

27 #1

Exhibit A - Missouri Docket Sheet

#27

(#27) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Missouri Docket Sheet)(Mooney, William) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (MRC) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 5:18-cv-00466. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER: 1. Parties' #29 JOINT MOTION to Change Venue is GRANTED. 2. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this matter to the Eastern District of Missouri, Eastern Division. 3. All further filings in this case shall be filed with that Court. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/7/2019.(JJ)cc: COR (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re #29 JOINT MOTION to Change Venue by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC (JJ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) JOINT MOTION to Change Venue by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order -Agreed Order of Transfer)(Mooney, William) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #28 Joint Status Report (JJ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Memorandum and Order)(Mooney, William) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #27 Status Report (JJ) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Missouri Docket Sheet)(Mooney, William) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #26 Joint Status Report (JJ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Andrew Smith. #8 Response in Opposition to Motion has been filed by Power Investments, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (GLD) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC filed by Power Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Mason L. Miller 8/21/18, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Andrew) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-MLM Legal Articles of Org, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C-Missouri Compl, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D-Becker Summons & Sec of State Filing, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT E - SL EC Sec of State Return, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT F - Leara Aff, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT G - SLEC Summons and Green Card Signed by Mooney, #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT H - Motion to Set Aside, #10 Exhibit EXHIBIT I - Subpoenas to Banks, #11 Exhibit EXHIBIT J - Response to Motion to Quash, #12 Exhibit EXHIBIT K - Suburban Heights Prom Note and Bank Account Statement, #13 Exhibit EXHIBIT L - Order Setting Aside Default Judgment, #14 Exhibit EXHIBIT M - 2nd Missouri Action, #15 Exhibit EXHIBIT N - Mason Miller Affidavit, #16 Exhibit EXHIBIT O - Mike Becker Affidavit, #17 Proposed Order 2018-07-31 Defendants Proposed Order for MTD)(Mooney, William) Modified on 7/12/2019 (GLD). (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENTPURSUANT TO FED. R.CIV. P.71 by Michael F. Becker, SL EC, LLC. (Mooney, William) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Dylan Maschmeyer by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (STC) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Robert L. Brown by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (STC) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, William Mooney. #1 Notice of Removal has been filed by SL EC, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (STC) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (STC) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Fayette Circuit Court, filed by Power Investments, LLC.(MRC) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 17-CI-03850. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4127603), filed by SL EC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(STC) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.