This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 06:01:54 (UTC).

Powell v. Whidden et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 Powell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Whidden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-03322

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shane Powell

Defendants

Ivan Louis Whidden

Celadon Trucking Services Inc

Celadon Trucking Services Inc doing business as Celadon Trucking doing business as Cladon Trucking

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond T Wooten

Attorney at Smith Jordan Lavery and Lee

Po Box 1207

Easley, SC 29641

Defendant Attorneys

Marshall Collin Crane

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow PA

1515 Lady Street, Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29201

Mark Steven Barrow

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow

Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29211

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Celadon Trucking Services, Inc. by Celadon Trucking Services Inc. (Crane, Marshall) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 1/30/2020 11:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 12/11/2019. (abuc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#8

(#8) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 12/31/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/24/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/20/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/20/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/11/2020, Discovery due by 6/8/2020, Motion in Limine due by 8/7/2020, Motions due by 6/22/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/17/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 9/8/2020, Mediation Due by 7/6/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 12/11/2019. (abuc) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/12/2019) (abuc, ). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#7

(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Shane Powell.(Wooten, Raymond) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#4

(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Celadon Trucking Services Inc, Ivan Louis Whidden.(alew, ) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Celadon Trucking Services Inc, Ivan Louis Whidden.(alew, ) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

1 #1

State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oconee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-37-00682. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8797498), filed by Celadon Trucking Services Inc, Ivan Louis Whidden. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(alew, ) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Celadon Trucking Services, Inc. by Celadon Trucking Services Inc. (Crane, Marshall) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 1/30/2020 11:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 12/11/2019. (abuc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 12/31/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/24/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/20/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/20/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/11/2020, Discovery due by 6/8/2020, Motion in Limine due by 8/7/2020, Motions due by 6/22/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/17/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 9/8/2020, Mediation Due by 7/6/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 12/11/2019. (abuc) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/12/2019) (abuc, ). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Shane Powell.(Wooten, Raymond) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • (#5) CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is directed to file their Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories no later than 12/10/19. (alew, ) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Celadon Trucking Services Inc, Ivan Louis Whidden.(alew, ) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Celadon Trucking Services Inc, Ivan Louis Whidden.(alew, ) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oconee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-37-00682. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8797498), filed by Celadon Trucking Services Inc, Ivan Louis Whidden. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(alew, ) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CELADON TRUCKING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond T Wooten