This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:41:15 (UTC).

POWELL v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 POWELL filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph H. Rodriguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-17226

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph H. Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MICHAEL POWELL

Lewisburg, PA 17837

Respondent

THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

JACQUELINE CARLE

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY

401 Market Street, 4Th Floor

Camden, NJ 08101

JENNIFER LYNN DAVENPORT

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY

Clarkson S. Fisher Federal Building & Courthouse, 402 East State Street, Room 430

Trenton, NJ 08608

MATTHEW J. SKAHILL

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

401 Market Street, 4Th Floor

Camden, NJ 08101

JEFFREY BRIAN BENDER

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY

401 Market Street, 4Th Floor

Camden, NJ 08101

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Letter from Michael Powell addressed to Judge Rodriguez. (rtm, )(nm) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER that Powell may submit a response within 60 days of receiving the United States 9/3/2019 opposition. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 9/5/2019. (rtm, )(nm) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Letter from United States in opposition to Powell's Section 2255 motion re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255),. (BENDER, JEFFREY) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

1 #2

Third Circuit Order

1 #1

First Motion to Vacate Sentence

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) pursuant to the Johnson Ruling, forwarded to the FPDs Office In Re to Criminal Case file 08-592 (JHR), filed by MICHAEL POWELL. (Attachments: #1 First Motion to Vacate Sentence, #2 Third Circuit Order)(cry, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from Michael Powell addressed to Judge Rodriguez. (rtm, )(nm) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER that Powell may submit a response within 60 days of receiving the United States 9/3/2019 opposition. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 9/5/2019. (rtm, )(nm) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter from United States in opposition to Powell's Section 2255 motion re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255),. (BENDER, JEFFREY) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) pursuant to the Johnson Ruling, forwarded to the FPDs Office In Re to Criminal Case file 08-592 (JHR), filed by MICHAEL POWELL. (Attachments: #1 First Motion to Vacate Sentence, #2 Third Circuit Order)(cry, ) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.