This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2021 at 11:26:00 (UTC).

Powell v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 Powell filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nina Y. Wang and Robert E. Blackburn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01838

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nina Y. Wang

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Blackburn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trisha Powell

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dominic Xavier Genco

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Defendant Attorney

Lawrence Michael Brooks, Jr.

Attorney at Wells Anderson & Race LLC

1700 Broadway, Suite 1020

Denver, CO 80290-1001

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 9/8/2021 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Discovery due by 5/20/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/20/2022. FTR: NYW-FTR. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#16

(#16) Proposed Scheduling Order (filed on behalf of both parties) by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Brooks, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/29/2021. A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/8/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 8/25/2021. The parties shall electronically file their proposed scheduling order and also provide a copy in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 9/1/2021. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dominic Xavier Genco on behalf of Trisha PowellAttorney Dominic Xavier Genco added to party Trisha Powell(pty:pla) (Genco, Dominic) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER and Jury Demand to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet, and Summons upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 06/07/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Trisha Powell.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

1 #13

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Exhibit Exhibit L to Notice of Removal

1 #11

Exhibit Exhibit K to Notice of Removal

1 #10

Exhibit Exhibit J to Notice of Removal

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibit I to Notice of Removal

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit G to Notice of Removal

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit F to Notice of Removal

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E to Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 9/8/2021 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Discovery due by 5/20/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/20/2022. FTR: NYW-FTR. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Proposed Scheduling Order (filed on behalf of both parties) by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Brooks, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docket(#15) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/31/21. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER: In light of the #12 Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge, the Status Conference set for September 1, 2021 is hereby vacated. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/30/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docket(#13) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent/Non Consent Form to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01838-REB. (Text Only Entry) (alave, ) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Brooks, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to #9 Order, the Parties were to file a completed Consent Form by August 25, 2021. Having not received a completed Consent Form, and having not provided an extension of time to file the Consent Form, a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 9/1/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The Parties shall be prepared to discuss their failure to file the Consent Form by the August 25 deadline. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. The court will automatically vacate the Status Conference upon the filing of a completed Consent Form. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/26/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER: As of August 16, 2021, the public health risks caused by the coronavirus, and in particular, the Delta variant of the coronavirus, continue to be present. In order to support public health efforts to cabin the spread of the coronavirus, to protect the health of the Parties and counsel by minimizing their need to travel, and to protect the health of the general public, the following measures are adopted in an abundance of caution. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED THAT: (1) All proceedings, notwithstanding any evidentiary proceedings, including but not limited to trials, which are scheduled to occur through January 1, 2022 and before the undersigned, shall be held via telephone conference, unless otherwise ordered by the court. Participants may access this court's conference line by using the following dial-in information: 1-888-363-4749, Access Code 5738976. This Amended Standing Order does not apply to any criminal matters; evidentiary civil matters; or other matters specifically set after the effective date to be in-person, presently scheduled through January 1, 2022; (2) All jury trials scheduled to occur through January 1, 2022 shall proceed as scheduled, pursuant to the District of Colorado's Jury Trial Protocols and its effective General Order(s), available at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/CourtOperations/COVID-19Guidance.aspx; and (3) Parties and/or counsel are advised to check information on the website of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado (http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/) and specifically, for Magistrate Judge Wang, for continuing information. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/19/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, ) Text Only Entry (nywlc1, ) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/29/2021. A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/8/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 8/25/2021. The parties shall electronically file their proposed scheduling order and also provide a copy in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 9/1/2021. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dominic Xavier Genco on behalf of Trisha PowellAttorney Dominic Xavier Genco added to party Trisha Powell(pty:pla) (Genco, Dominic) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER and Jury Demand to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet, and Summons upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 06/07/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Trisha Powell.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2021CV31696. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7946625), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H to Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I to Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J to Notice of Removal, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K to Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L to Notice of Removal, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Brooks, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence Michael Brooks, Jr.