This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:59:31 (UTC).

Powell v. National Collection Systems Inc

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Powell filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against National Collection Systems Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00009

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashley Powell

Defendant

National Collection Systems Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony Hernandez

4041 Ne Lakewood Way, Suite 200

Lee'S Summit, MO 64064

Defendant Attorney

Louis J. Wade

Attorney at McDowell, Rice, Smith & Buchanan, PC-KCMO

605 West 47Th Street, Suite 350

Kansas City, MO 64112-1900

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of National Collection Systems Inc.(Attorney Louis J. Wade added to party National Collection Systems Inc(pty:dft))(Wade, Louis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against National Collection Systems Inc filed by Anthony Hernandez on behalf of Ashley Powell. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6653648. Service due by 4/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hernandez, Anthony) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Louis J. Wade on behalf of Defendant National Collection Systems Inc.(Wade, Louis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

2 #1

MAP General Order

#5

(#5) RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 2/14/20 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 2/14/20 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Louis J. Wade on behalf of Defendant National Collection Systems Inc.(Wade, Louis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of National Collection Systems Inc.(Attorney Louis J. Wade added to party National Collection Systems Inc(pty:dft))(Wade, Louis) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Collection Systems Inc. (Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against National Collection Systems Inc filed by Anthony Hernandez on behalf of Ashley Powell. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6653648. Service due by 4/6/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hernandez, Anthony) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.