This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 08:59:33 (UTC).

Powell v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Powell filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark Pittman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00737

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mr. Donnie L Powell

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vincent Paul Circelli

Attorney at Circelli Walter & Young PLLC

500 East 4Th Street, Suite 250

Fort Worth, TX 76102

George Parker Young

Attorney at Circelli Walter & Young PLLC

500 East 4Th Street, Suite 250

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Kelli Larsen Walter

Attorney at Cercelli Walter & Young PLLC

500 E 4Th Street, Suite 250

Fort Worth, TX 76102

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-226): The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2741, and that order has now been filed in the Northern District of California. (wxc) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Monsanto Company. Waiver sent on 7/20/2020. (Circelli, Vincent) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wrb) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Donnie L Powell. (Circelli, Vincent) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Monsanto Company filed by Donnie L Powell. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11005291) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Circelli, Vincent) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCase transferred from NDTX has been opened in California Northern District as case number 3:20-cv-05623. (wxc) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketInterdistrict Transfer to California Northern; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in California Northern. (wxc) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-226): The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2741, and that order has now been filed in the Northern District of California. (wxc) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Monsanto Company. Waiver sent on 7/20/2020. (Circelli, Vincent) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wrb) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Donnie L Powell. (Circelli, Vincent) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Monsanto Company filed by Donnie L Powell. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11005291) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Circelli, Vincent) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less