This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2021 at 08:56:47 (UTC).

Powell v. JPMCB Card Services

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 Powell filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against JPMCB Card Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Noelle C. Collins and Sarah E. Pitlyk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00694

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Noelle C. Collins

Sarah E. Pitlyk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Traci N. Powell

Florissant, MO 63033

Defendant

JPMCB Card Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Adrian S. Mehdirad

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - St Louis

One Us Bank Plaza, 505 N. 7Th Street

St. Louis, MO 63101

David M. Mangian

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - St Louis

One Us Bank Plaza, 505 N. 7Th Street

St. Louis, MO 63101

Christopher M. Hohn

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - St Louis

One Us Bank Plaza, 505 N. 7Th Street

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Notice of Removal

#2

#3

3 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Docket & Pleadings

3 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #3

Original Filing Form

#4

#5

#6

#8

#9

#10

#12

#13

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant JPMCB Card Services Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Defendant JPMCB Card Services Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant JPMCB Card Services. (Mangian, David) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant JPMCB Card Services Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant JPMCB Card Services. (Mangian, David) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. Tue Jul 20 14:55:43 CDT 2021 (Kratzer, Katie) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant JPMCB Card Services. (Mehdirad, Adrian) filed by JPMCB Card Services; ORDERED GRANTED JPMCB Card Services answer due 7/22/2021. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 7/20/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant JPMCB Card Services. (Mehdirad, Adrian) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher M. Hohn for Defendant JPMCB Card Services. (Hohn, Christopher) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Thu Jun 17 10:12:07 CDT 2021 (Spurgeon, Katherine) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings. (KXS) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docket(#7) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (JWD) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Traci N. Powell.(JWD) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant JPMCB Card Services Sent To: State Court - Executed (Mehdirad, Adrian) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Adrian S. Mehdirad for Defendant JPMCB Card Services. (Mehdirad, Adrian) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court case number 21SL-SC00214 in the amount of $402.00 receipt number AMOEDC-8701328, by Defendant JPMCB Card Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket & Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Mangian, David) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant JPMCB Card Services. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None. (Mangian, David) Modified on 6/15/2021 to correct docketing event used. Filer used wrong filing event (JWD). (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant JPMCB Card Services Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Mangian, David) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMCB-Card Service is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M Mangian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Martin Hohn