This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2021 at 08:38:46 (UTC).

Powell v. Family Dollar, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 Powell filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Family Dollar, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Hildy Bowbeer and Wilhelmina M. Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-02504

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Hildy Bowbeer

Presiding Judge

Wilhelmina M. Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shanasti Powell

Defendant

Family Dollar, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tyler W Brennan

Attorney at Tyler W. Brennan Law, LLC

323 N. Washington Ave., Ste 200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Defendant Attorneys

Molly E Nephew

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

225 South 6Th Street, Ste 1800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Patrick R Martin

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

225 South Sixth Street, Ste 1800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Family Dollar, Inc.. (Nephew, Molly) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion for Defendant's Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint. Family Dollar, Inc. answer due 1/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/11/2020. (JMK) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Family Dollar, Inc..(Nephew, Molly) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Family Dollar, Inc.. (Nephew, Molly) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Family Dollar, Inc. re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Nephew, Molly) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Family Dollar, Inc.. (Nephew, Molly) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C - First Amended Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B - Ramsey County Docket

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, case number 62-CV-20-5342 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8294628) filed by Family Dollar, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Ramsey County Docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C - First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nephew, Molly) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Family Dollar, Inc.. (Nephew, Molly) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docket(#9) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion for Defendant's Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint. Family Dollar, Inc. answer due 1/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/11/2020. (JMK) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket(#7) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Family Dollar, Inc..(Nephew, Molly) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Family Dollar, Inc.. (Nephew, Molly) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-2504 (WMW/HB). (KNK) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Family Dollar, Inc. re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Nephew, Molly) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Family Dollar, Inc.. (Nephew, Molly) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, case number 62-CV-20-5342 (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8294628) filed by Family Dollar, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Ramsey County Docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C - First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nephew, Molly) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAMILY DOLLAR SERVICES, LLC is a litigant