This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2020 at 07:28:37 (UTC).

Powell v. KFK Group Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Powell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KFK Group Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Barry W Ashe and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13705

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barry W Ashe

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnshane Powell

Defendants

RH Eastlake, LLC

Eastlake Development, LLC

Dasmen Residential Management, LLC

Wilshire Insurance Company

Lind Property Management, LLC

KFK Group, Inc.

Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc.

KFK Development, LLC

Dasmen Residential, LLC

Unidentified Party

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DeVonn Henry-Joseph Jarrett

Attorney at Jarrett Law Group

643 Magazine Street, Suite 301A

New Orleans, LA 70130

Suzette Peychaud Bagneris

Attorney at Bagneris Firm, LLC

2714 Canal Street, Suite 403

New Orleans, LA 70119

Emile Anthony Bagneris, III

Attorney at The Bagneris Firm

2714 Canal Street, Suite 403

New Orleans, LA 70119

Defendant Attorneys

Emily E. Eagan

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Ernest Paul Gieger, Jr.

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Tucker Tyler Bohren

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Michael Edward Hill

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Nicholas Stephen Bergeron

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

David F. Waguespack

Attorney at Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

David Scotton

Attorney at Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux,

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

Andrew J Brien

Attorney at Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

Mary Kerrigan Dennard

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Dakota Kyle Chenevert

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Tabitha Robertson Durbin

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Lafayette)

100 E. Vermillion St., Suite 300

Lafayette, LA 70501

Jennifer E. Michel

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Lafayette)

100 E. Vermillion St., Suite 300

Lafayette, LA 70501

Gustave A. Fritchie, III

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Troy Lashon Bell

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

#18

17 #1

Proposed Order

#17

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

#15

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, First Amended Petition for Damages by Wilshire Insurance Company.(Durbin, Tabitha) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants, Eastlake Development, L.L.C., KFK Development, L.L.C., and KFK Group, Inc., shall have an additional thirty (30) days, or up to and including February 5, 2020, to respond to the First Amended Petition for Damages filed by Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 1/9/2020. (sa) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, First Amended Petition for Damages by Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc.(Bell, Troy) (Main Document 19 replaced with corrected title page on 1/9/2020) (sa). Modified text/attachment on 1/9/2020 (sa). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Troy Lashon Bell for Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 01/08/2020. (am) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Troy Bell by Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fritchie, Gustave) Modified text on 1/8/2020 (am). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Eastlake Development, LLC, KFK Development, LLC, KFK Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney David F. Waguespack added to party KFK Development, LLC(pty:dft).(Waguespack, David) Modified text on 1/7/2020 (am). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #14 motion is GRANTED. Defendant Wilshire Insurance Company, pursuant to Local Rule 7.8, is granted an extension of time of twenty- one (21) days in which to file responsive pleadings to the Plaintiffs First Amended Petition for Damages from the time otherwise due, up through and including January 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/23/2019. (am) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Wilshire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Tabitha Robertson Durbin added to party Wilshire Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Durbin, Tabitha) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants, Eastlake Development, L.L.C., KFK Development, L.L.C., and KFK Group, Inc., shall have an additional twenty-one (21) days, or up to and including January 6, 2020, to respond to the First Amended Petition for Damages filed by Plaintiff, Johnshane Powell. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/17/2019. (am) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Damages by Eastlake Development, LLC, KFK Development, LLC, KFK Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Andrew J Brien added to party KFK Development, LLC(pty:dft).(Brien, Andrew) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Gustave A. Fritchie, III added to party Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc.(pty:dft).(Fritchie, Gustave) Modified text on 12/11/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Notice of Compliance.** Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 3. Clerk properly linked document to document 1.** (am) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Compliance by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State court returns of service)(Bohren, Tucker) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 First Amended Petition for Damages, with Jury Demand by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC.(Bohren, Tucker) Modified text on 12/4/2019 (am). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by RH Eastlake, LLC (Bohren, Tucker) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC (Bohren, Tucker) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 11/19/2019.(sbs) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DIRECTIVE OF THE CLERK regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC. By the Clerk.(sbs) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-3529 N (8) (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-7980399) filed by RH Eastlake, LLC, Dasmen Residential Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Tucker Tyler Bohren added to party Dasmen Residential Management, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Tucker Tyler Bohren added to party Eastlake Development, LLC(pty:dft).(Bohren, Tucker) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/19/2019) (sbs). Modified text and filer on 11/19/2019 (sbs). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KFK Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Dasmen Residential LLC is a litigant