This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2021 at 09:38:54 (UTC).

Powell v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Powell filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Madeline Hughes Haikala. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00277

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Madeline Hughes Haikala

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jonathon Powell

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arati C Furness

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Matthew Ryan McCarley

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Kelly Chermack

Attorney at FEARS NACHAWATI, PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Jon Collins Conlin

Attorney at CORY WATSON ATTORNEYS

2131 Magnolia Avenue

Birmingham, AL 35205

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B North, Jr

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH

First Union Plaza, Suite 1400, 999 Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309

Brandee J Kowalzyk

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP

201 17Th Street Nw Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

George L Morris, IV

Attorney at CABANISS JOHNSTON GARDNER DUMAS & O'NEAL LLP

2001 Park Place North, Suite 700, P O Box 830612

Birmingham, AL 35283-0612

Taylor Tapley Daly

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH LLP

201 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Diane B Maughan

Attorney at CABANISS JOHNSTON GARDNER DUMAS & O'NEAL

2001 Park Place North, Suite 700

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#19

18 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#18

16 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Brandee Kowalzyk

#16

14 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Taylor Daly

#14

#12

#11

#10

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) TEXT ORDER: The parties have filed a Joint Rule 26(f) Report, Notice of Settlement and Motion to Stay. (Doc. #19 ). The Court grants the motion to stay this action for 90 days to allow the parties time to finalize the settlement. On or before July 9, 2021, the parties shall please file a joint stipulation of dismissal or a joint report updating the Court on the status of the settlement. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 4/8/2021. (YMB) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint MOTION to Stay and Rule 26 Report and Notice of Settlement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Daly, Taylor) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathon Powell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Chermack, Kelly) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Attorney Brandee Kowalzyk's motion for admission pro hac vice in this action. (Doc. #16 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/25/2021. (YMB) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3804600. (Morris, George) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brandee J. Kowalzyk by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Brandee Kowalzyk)(Morris, George) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3803675 (B4601112206). (Morris, George) Modified on 3/24/2021 (MRR, ). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Attorney Taylor T. Daly's motion for admission pro hac vice in this action. (Doc. #14 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/23/2021. (YMB) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Taylor T. Daly by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Taylor Daly)(Morris, George) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Attorney Richard B. North, Jr's motion to withdraw as counsel of record in this action. (Doc. #12 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/10/2021. (YMB) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER: This action has returned to this district from MDL proceedings. The Court sets this matter for a telephone status conference at 1:00 p.m. CST on April 12, 2021. Counsel of record shall please dial 877-873-8018 and enter access code 5313999 to participate in the conference. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/2/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by George L Morris, IV on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Morris, George) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Diane B Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02353. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Alabama via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.] (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/12/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.] (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-2353-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.] (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16772838 filed by Jonathon Powell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.] (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly Chermack

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon C. Conlin