This case was last updated from PACER on 07/07/2020 at 08:38:08 (UTC).

Powell et al v. Wright Medical Technology

Case Summary

On 05/08/2020 Powell filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Shelby and Jared C. Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00306

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Shelby

Referral Judge

Jared C. Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Patricia L. Powell

Robert B. Powell

Defendant

Wright Medical Technology

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brady L. Rasmussen

Attorney at JONES WALDO HOLBROOK & MCDONOUGH

170 S Main St Ste 1500

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Michael L. McGlamry

Attorney at POPE MCGLAMRY PC

3391 Peachtree Rd Ne Ste 300

Atlanta, GA 30326

Defendant Attorney

Elisabeth M. McOmber

Attorney at SNELL & WILMER LLP

15 W South Temple Ste 1200, Gateway Tower West

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 6/24/2020. (jwt) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology identifying Wright Medical Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Wright Medical Technology. Attorney Elisabeth M. McOmber added to party Wright Medical Technology(pty:dft)(McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael L. McGlamry for Patricia L. Powell and Robert B. Powell.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 6/12/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order

5 #1

Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission

#5

(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael L. McGlamry , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3606663,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiffs Patricia L. Powell, Robert B. Powell. (Attachments: #1 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rasmussen, Brady) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT for Damages against Wright Medical Technology (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3570989) filed by Patricia L. Powell, Robert B. Powell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (Rasmussen, Brady) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Plaintiffs Patricia L. Powell and Robert B. Powell are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 6/24/2020. (jwt) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Wright Medical Technology identifying Wright Medical Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Wright Medical Technology. Attorney Elisabeth M. McOmber added to party Wright Medical Technology(pty:dft)(McOmber, Elisabeth) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 6/23/2020. (mjm) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael L. McGlamry for Patricia L. Powell and Robert B. Powell.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 6/12/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael L. McGlamry , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3606663,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiffs Patricia L. Powell, Robert B. Powell. (Attachments: #1 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rasmussen, Brady) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia L. Powell, Robert B. Powell as to Wright Medical Technology served on 6/3/2020, answer due 6/24/2020. (Rasmussen, Brady) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Wright Medical Technology. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT for Damages against Wright Medical Technology (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3570989) filed by Patricia L. Powell, Robert B. Powell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (Rasmussen, Brady) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Plaintiffs Patricia L. Powell and Robert B. Powell are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elisabeth M. McOmber