This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2020 at 07:44:11 (UTC).

Pounds v. K&M Capital LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 Pounds filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against K M Capital LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Billy Roy Wilson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00814

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Billy Roy Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arthur Pounds

Defendants

Kelly Joiner

K&M Capital LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Sanford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

One Financial Center, 650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Tess Elizabeth Bradford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

One Financial Center, 650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Defendant Attorney

Gregory James Northen

Attorney at Cross, Gunter, Witherspoon & Galchus, P.C.

Post Office Box 3178

Little Rock, AR 72203-3178

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory James Northen on behalf of All Defendants (Northen, Gregory) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#1

(#1) ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Arthur Pounds. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT074882.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kelly Joiner, K&M Capital LLC.(Northen, Gregory) (Docket entry modified on 1/13/2020 to establish linkage and correct the description.)(cmn) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#2

(#2) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Arthur Pounds (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#6

(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/19/2020. Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/2/2020. Bench Trial set for 1/19/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 1/10/20. (mmb) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to establish linkage and to correct the description as follows, "ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kelly Joiner, K&M Capital LLC" as marked on the document. (cmn) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/19/2020. Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/2/2020. Bench Trial set for 1/19/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 1/10/20. (mmb) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory James Northen on behalf of All Defendants (Northen, Gregory) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kelly Joiner, K&M Capital LLC.(Northen, Gregory) (Docket entry modified on 1/13/2020 to establish linkage and correct the description.)(cmn) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Defendants answer to the complaint is due on or before 5:00 PM, 1/10/2020. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/24/19. (mmb) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Arthur Pounds (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Arthur Pounds. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT074882.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.