This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2021 at 09:07:46 (UTC).

Potzner v. Bayer CropScience LP et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Potzner filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bayer CropScience LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Pitlyk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00813

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Pitlyk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

George Potzner

Defendants

Bayer CropScience L.P.

Bayer CropScience Inc

Corteva Inc.

Cargill Incorporated

BASF Corporation

Syngenta Corporation

Winfield Solutions, LLC

Univar Solutions, Inc.

Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.

Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.

CHS Inc.

Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.

Growmark Inc.

Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.

Tenkoz Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth A. Fegan

Attorney at FEGAN SCOTT LLC - Chicago

150 S. Wacker Dr., 24Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Jonathan D. Lindenfeld

Attorney at FEGAN SCOTT LLC - New York

140 Broadway, 46Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

#24

23 #1

*Restricted*

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: No,. Associated Cases: 4:21-md-02993-SEP et al.(Echols, Barack) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00535. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.(DLB) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Eastern District of Missouri and MDL 2993 In Re: Crop Inputs Antitrust Litigation.(lmb) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PRELIMINARY CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2). (lmb) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Cargill, Incorporated waiver sent on 6/10/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Federated Co-Operatives Ltd. waiver sent on 6/17/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Corteva Inc. waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021; Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Bayer CropScience LP waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021; Bayer CropScience, Inc. waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Syngenta Corporation waiver sent on 6/14/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Growmark Inc. waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STRICKEN WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Growmark Inc. waiver sent on 6/18/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan) Modified on 6/21/2021 (kdw). (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STRICKEN WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Tenkoz Inc. waiver sent on 6/21/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan) Modified on 6/21/2021 (kdw). (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Winfield Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George Potzner. Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc. waiver sent on 6/14/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. CHS Inc. waiver sent on 6/14/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan D. Lindenfeld on behalf of George Potzner. (clt)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan D. Lindenfeld $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4497027 by on behalf of George Potzner. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Fegan on behalf of George Potzner (Fegan, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:21-cv-00535-NJR. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (clt) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4493476.), filed by George Potzner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fegan, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Federated Co-operatives Ltd. is a litigant