This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/17/2019 at 07:38:19 (UTC).

Potts v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 Potts filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00727

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrea Potts

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert L. Beard, Jr.

Attorney at Rainwater, Holt & Sexton P.A.

Post Office Box 17250

Little Rock, AR 72222-7250

Defendant Attorney

John E. Moore

Attorney at Munson, Rowlett, Moore & Boone, P.A.

Regions Center, Suite 1900, 400 West Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Andrea Potts. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 10/4/2019. (Beard, Robert) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#7

(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/3/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/17/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 11/9/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 11/04/2019. (tmw) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#5

(#5) DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (jbh) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (jbh) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (jbh) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Andrea Potts. (jbh) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Saline County Circuit Court, case number 63CV-19-01032. Fee of $400 paid; receipt number LIT074392. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2019: #2 Main Document - Correct) (jak). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Andrea Potts. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 10/4/2019. (Beard, Robert) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/3/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/17/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 11/9/2020 at 09:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4C before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 11/04/2019. (tmw) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #1 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (jbh) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (jbh) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (jbh) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Andrea Potts. (jbh) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Saline County Circuit Court, case number 63CV-19-01032. Fee of $400 paid; receipt number LIT074392. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2019: #2 Main Document - Correct) (jak). (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L. Beard, Jr.