This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2019 at 06:24:13 (UTC).

Potter-Valmond v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Potter-Valmond filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Sanofi US Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14561

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Calen Potter-Valmond

Defendants

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.

Sun Pharma Global FZE

Hospira, Inc.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Accord Healthcare, Inc.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Sandoz Inc.

Hospira Worldwide, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Ryan McCarley

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

3 #4

Summons

3 #3

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(caa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8021195) filed by Calen Potter-Valmond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley added to party Calen Potter-Valmond(pty:pla).(McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(caa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8021195) filed by Calen Potter-Valmond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley added to party Calen Potter-Valmond(pty:pla).(McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.