This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2020 at 14:35:25 (UTC).

Potter v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Potter filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan P. Watters. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00095

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kim Potter

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ben T. Sather

Attorney at SATHER LAW, PLLC

2301 Montana Ave., Ste. 202, Po Box 1115

Billings, MT 59103

Dana Lizik

Attorney at JOHNSON LAW GROUP

2925 Richmond Avenue, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Maxon R. Davis

Attorney at DAVIS HATLEY HAFFEMAN & TIGHE

Po Box 2103, 101 River Drive North The Milwaukee Station, Third Floor

Great Falls, MT 59401-2103

Pamela L. Ferrell

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

1170 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 1900

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Lawrence, Pamela) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#12

(#12) CM/ECF REGISTRATION LETTER for Pro Hac Vice attorney. (AMC) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice FOR PAMELA L. FERRELL. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/27/2020. (AMC) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

10 #3

Text of Proposed Order

10 #2

Supplement Certification of Pamela L. Ferrell

10 #1

Affidavit of Pamela L. Ferrell

#10

(#10) MOTION Pamela L. Ferrell to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2533744.) Maxon R. Davis appearing for Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Pamela L. Ferrell, #2 Supplement Certification of Pamela L. Ferrell, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Maxon) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#9

(#9) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/14/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 9/8/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 9/14/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 01:30 PM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/7/2020. (AMC) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Ethicon, Inc. answer due 9/2/2020; Johnson & Johnson answer due 9/2/2020. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 7/28/2020. (AMC) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Maxon R. Davis appearing for Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Maxon) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Plaintiffs Complaint, Summonses & Civil Cover Sheet served on Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc. on 07/13/2020, filed by Kim Potter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lizik, Dana) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Kim Potter re #4 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Lizik, Dana) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dana Lizik for Kim Potter. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 7/7/2020. (AMC) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

3 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

3 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Dana Lizik

#3

(#3) MOTION Dana Lizik to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2505261.) Ben T. Sather appearing for Plaintiff Kim Potter (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dana Lizik, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Sather, Ben) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Lawrence, Pamela) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CM/ECF REGISTRATION LETTER for Pro Hac Vice attorney. (AMC) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice FOR PAMELA L. FERRELL. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/27/2020. (AMC) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION Pamela L. Ferrell to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2533744.) Maxon R. Davis appearing for Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Pamela L. Ferrell, #2 Supplement Certification of Pamela L. Ferrell, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Maxon) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/14/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 9/8/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 9/14/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 01:30 PM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 8/7/2020. (AMC) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Ethicon, Inc. answer due 9/2/2020; Johnson & Johnson answer due 9/2/2020. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 7/28/2020. (AMC) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Maxon R. Davis appearing for Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Maxon) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Plaintiffs Complaint, Summonses & Civil Cover Sheet served on Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc. on 07/13/2020, filed by Kim Potter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lizik, Dana) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Kim Potter re #4 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Lizik, Dana) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dana Lizik for Kim Potter. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 7/7/2020. (AMC) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION Dana Lizik to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2505261.) Ben T. Sather appearing for Plaintiff Kim Potter (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dana Lizik, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Sather, Ben) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants.(Summons can be downloaded and printed off for service) (AMC) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketFiling fee PAID IN THE SHELL CASE: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2504599 (AMC) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Kim Potter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (AMC) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less