Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 09:07:02 (UTC).

POTTER v. ASHFORD UNIVERSITY et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 POTTER filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against ASHFORD UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLEN C WINSOR and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00106

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ALLEN C WINSOR

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Sidney Potter

Pasadena, CA 91102

Defendants

Irene Stein

Scott Burrus

Zovio, Inc.

Craig D. Swenson

Andrew Clark

Ashford University

Kenneth Fettig

William Hodde

CRAIG D SWENSON

ZOVIO INC

BRIDGEPOINT EDUCATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

SEAN PATRICK WALSH

Attorney at MCGUIRE WOODS LLP - JACKSONVILLE FL

50 N Laura St - Ste 3300

Jacksonville, FL 32202

THOMAS R BRICE

Attorney at MCGUIRE WOODS LLP - JACKSONVILLE FL

50 N Laura St - Ste 3300

Jacksonville, FL 32202

CAMERON G KYNES

Attorney at MCGUIRE WOODS LLP - JACKSONVILLE FL

50 N Laura St - Ste 3300

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California filed by ASHFORD UNIVERSITY, SCOTT BURRUS, ANDREW CLARK, KENNETH FETTIG, WILLIAM HODDE, IRENE STEIN, CRAIG D SWENSON, ZOVIO INC. (KYNES, CAMERON) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#10

(#10) REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File. On or before March 25, 2020, Defendants may file a reply to Plaintiff's "Answer to Motion to Transfer." Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 3/18/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to File re #8 Response in Opposition to Motion "Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Answer to Motion to Transfer" by ASHFORD UNIVERSITY, SCOTT BURRUS, ANDREW CLARK, KENNETH FETTIG, WILLIAM HODDE, IRENE STEIN, CRAIG D SWENSON, ZOVIO INC. (KYNES, CAMERON) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California filed by DAVID SIDNEY POTTER. (jcw) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER entered on #6 Motion to Transfer Case. If Plaintiff opposes Defendants' motion to transfer, he must file a memorandum of law in opposition on or before March 24, 2020. If Plaintiff elects not to file a response in opposition to Defendants' motion to transfer or fails to do so on or before March 24, 2020, this court will presume that Plaintiff does not oppose the motion, and this court likely will recommend that the District Court grant Defendants' motion to transfer. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 3/10/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California by ASHFORD UNIVERSITY, SCOTT BURRUS, ANDREW CLARK, KENNETH FETTIG, WILLIAM HODDE, IRENE STEIN, CRAIG D SWENSON, ZOVIO INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/20/2020). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (KYNES, CAMERON) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION Defendant's Opposition to State Court Motions by ASHFORD UNIVERSITY, SCOTT BURRUS, ANDREW CLARK, KENNETH FETTIG, WILLIAM HODDE, IRENE STEIN, CRAIG D SWENSON, ZOVIO INC. (KYNES, CAMERON) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Stay. On or before March 6, 2020, Defendants shall file a motion to transfer. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the complaint will be stayed until twenty-one days after this court's ruling on Defendants' motion to transfer. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 2/28/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#3

(#3) Defendant's Motion to Stay Deadline to File Response to Complaint Pending Resolution of Forthcoming Motion to Transfer by ASHFORD UNIVERSITY, SCOTT BURRUS, ANDREW CLARK, KENNETH FETTIG, WILLIAM HODDE, IRENE STEIN, CRAIG D SWENSON, ZOVIO INC. (WALSH, SEAN) Modified to edit title on 2/28/2020 (rcb). (Entered: 02/27/2020)

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kenneth Fettig, Zovio, Inc., William Hodde, Scott Burrus, Ashford University, Irene Stein, Andrew Clark, Craig D. Swenson from Circuit Court, Second Judicial Circuit, in and for Leon County, case number 2019-CA-002575. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4885929.), filed by Kenneth Fettig, Zovio, Inc., William Hodde, Scott Burrus, Ashford University, Irene Stein, Andrew Clark, Craig D. Swenson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (WALSH, SEAN) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #11 Reply to Response to Motion,. (jcw) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California filed by ASHFORD UNIVERSITY, SCOTT BURRUS, ANDREW CLARK, KENNETH FETTIG, WILLIAM HODDE, IRENE STEIN, CRAIG D SWENSON, ZOVIO INC. (KYNES, CAMERON) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings Reply may be filed by 3/25/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File. On or before March 25, 2020, Defendants may file a reply to Plaintiff's "Answer to Motion to Transfer." Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 3/18/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #9 MOTION for Leave to File re #8 Response in Opposition to Motion "Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Answer to Motion to Transfer". Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to File re #8 Response in Opposition to Motion "Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Answer to Motion to Transfer" by ASHFORD UNIVERSITY, SCOTT BURRUS, ANDREW CLARK, KENNETH FETTIG, WILLIAM HODDE, IRENE STEIN, CRAIG D SWENSON, ZOVIO INC. (KYNES, CAMERON) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #8 ANSWER to Motion. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California filed by DAVID SIDNEY POTTER. (jcw) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/24/2020). (jcw) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER entered on #6 Motion to Transfer Case. If Plaintiff opposes Defendants' motion to transfer, he must file a memorandum of law in opposition on or before March 24, 2020. If Plaintiff elects not to file a response in opposition to Defendants' motion to transfer or fails to do so on or before March 24, 2020, this court will presume that Plaintiff does not oppose the motion, and this court likely will recommend that the District Court grant Defendants' motion to transfer. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 3/10/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION Defendant's Opposition to State Court Motions , #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California . Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California by ASHFORD UNIVERSITY, SCOTT BURRUS, ANDREW CLARK, KENNETH FETTIG, WILLIAM HODDE, IRENE STEIN, CRAIG D SWENSON, ZOVIO INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/20/2020). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (KYNES, CAMERON) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION Defendant's Opposition to State Court Motions by ASHFORD UNIVERSITY, SCOTT BURRUS, ANDREW CLARK, KENNETH FETTIG, WILLIAM HODDE, IRENE STEIN, CRAIG D SWENSON, ZOVIO INC. (KYNES, CAMERON) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings - Motion to Transfer due by 3/6/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Stay. On or before March 6, 2020, Defendants shall file a motion to transfer. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the complaint will be stayed until twenty-one days after this court's ruling on Defendants' motion to transfer. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 2/28/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: NEW PRO SE NON PRISONER CASE - #1 Notice of Removal and #3 MOTION to Stay Deadline to File Response to Complaint Pending Resolution of Forthcoming Motion to Transfer - Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (tss) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendant's Motion to Stay Deadline to File Response to Complaint Pending Resolution of Forthcoming Motion to Transfer by ASHFORD UNIVERSITY, SCOTT BURRUS, ANDREW CLARK, KENNETH FETTIG, WILLIAM HODDE, IRENE STEIN, CRAIG D SWENSON, ZOVIO INC. (WALSH, SEAN) Modified to edit title on 2/28/2020 (rcb). (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ASHFORD UNIVERSITY, SCOTT BURRUS, ANDREW CLARK, KENNETH FETTIG, WILLIAM HODDE, IRENE STEIN, CRAIG D SWENSON, ZOVIO INC identifying Corporate Parent Zovio, Inc. for ZOVIO INC.. (WALSH, SEAN) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kenneth Fettig, Zovio, Inc., William Hodde, Scott Burrus, Ashford University, Irene Stein, Andrew Clark, Craig D. Swenson from Circuit Court, Second Judicial Circuit, in and for Leon County, case number 2019-CA-002575. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4885929.), filed by Kenneth Fettig, Zovio, Inc., William Hodde, Scott Burrus, Ashford University, Irene Stein, Andrew Clark, Craig D. Swenson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (WALSH, SEAN) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ashford University, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEAN PATRICK WALSH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas R Brice