This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2020 at 09:48:45 (UTC).

Potomac Edison Company v. Howard Industries, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Potomac Edison Company filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Howard Industries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas S. Kleeh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00042

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Kleeh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Potomac Edison Company

Defendant

Howard Industries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John C. Rogers

Attorney at John C. Rogers, Esq.

11 Commerce Drive, Suite 103

Westover, WV 26501

Defendant Attorney

Bradley K. Shafer

Attorney at Mintzer, Sarowitz, Zeris, Ledva & Meyers, LLP

48 Fourteenth Street - Suite 200

Wheeling, WV 26003

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#4

#3

#2

1 #9

State Court CMRR

1 #8

State Court CMRR

1 #7

State Court Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

State Court Complaint

1 #5

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #4

Notice of Appearance

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting Other Document filed by Potomac Edison Company. (Rogers, John) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Scheduling Order Checklist Other Document filed by Potomac Edison Company. (Rogers, John) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Potomac Edison Company identifying Corporate Parent FirstEnergy Corp. for Potomac Edison Company.. (Rogers, John) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Howard Industries, Inc..(Shafer, Bradley) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Howard Industries, Inc., filed by Potomac Edison Company.(Rogers, John) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 11/20/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/4/2020. Discovery due by 12/21/2020. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 10/20/2020. (cnd) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Howard Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Shafer, Bradley) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Howard Industries, Inc.. (Shafer, Bradley) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to John Rogers re #1 Notice of Removal. (fax to Atty Rogers) (cnd) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Hardy County Circuit Court, (case number 20-C-34), filed by Howard Industries, Inc. Filing Fee PAID on 10/20/2020. Receipt #0424-3139274. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Tracking Information, #3 Notice of Summons, #4 Notice of Appearance, #5 State Court Docket Sheet, #6 State Court Complaint, #7 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #8 State Court CMRR, #9 State Court CMRR)[Kleeh](cnd) Modified on 10/20/2020 - NEF generated to Atty Rogers (cnd). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Howard Industries, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Colquitt Rogers