This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/01/2022 at 07:55:26 (UTC).

Posten v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 2)

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Posten filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Alabama Department of Corrections INMATE 2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are W. Harold Albritton, III and Jerusha T. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00258

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

W. Harold Albritton, III

Referral Judge

Jerusha T. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeremy Charles Posten

Clio, AL 36017-2615

Defendants

Alabama Department of Corrections

Easterling Correctional Facility

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Easterling Correctional Facility, filed by Jeremy Charles Posten.(hrs, ) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jeremy Charles Posten. (hrs, ) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 5/20/2022, Plaintiff must submit an inmate account statement, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide a copy of this Order to the inmate account clerk at the facility where Plaintiff is detained. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 5/6/2022. (Copy mailed to Easterling CF Account Clerk as directed)(amf, ) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#4

(#4) RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: the undersigned Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS this case be DISMISSED without prejudice; Objections to R&R due by 7/15/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 6/30/2022. (amf, ) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: the undersigned Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS this case be DISMISSED without prejudice; Objections to R&R due by 7/15/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 6/30/2022. (amf, ) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 5/20/2022, Plaintiff must submit an inmate account statement, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide a copy of this Order to the inmate account clerk at the facility where Plaintiff is detained. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 5/6/2022. (Copy mailed to Easterling CF Account Clerk as directed)(amf, ) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jeremy Charles Posten. (hrs, ) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Department of Corrections, Easterling Correctional Facility, filed by Jeremy Charles Posten.(hrs, ) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alabama Department of Corrections is a litigant