Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2019 at 08:09:43 (UTC).

Post et al v. Hampton et al (PLR1)

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 Post filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Hampton PLR1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela L Reeves and Susan K Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00232

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela L Reeves

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Christian Heatherly

Athens, TN 37303

Paige Post

Defendants

McMinn county

Deputy Lieutenant Tony Parsons

Sheriff Joe Guy

Deputy Boo Alan Hampton

Deputy Matthew Williams

Deputy McKenzie Miller

Deputy Charles Haney

Joe Guy

Boo Alan Hampton

Charles Haney

Tony Parsons

McKenzie Miller

Matthew Williams

McMinn County, Tennessee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles P Dupree

Attorney at Charles P. Dupree, Attorney at Law

5708 Uptain Road, Suite 1200

Chattanooga, TN 37411

Defendant Attorneys

David J Ward

Attorney at Michel & Ward, PC

735 Broad Street, Suite 406

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Alix Michel

Attorney at Michel & Ward, PC

735 Broad Street, Suite 406

Chattanooga, TN 37402

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Paige Post.(Dupree, Charles) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Alix Michel on behalf of Boo Alan Hampton (Michel, Alix) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#22

(#22) NOTICE by McMinn County, Tennessee re #4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss That the Parties Are Conferring (Michel, Alix) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Alix Michel on behalf of Charles Haney (Michel, Alix) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Alix Michel on behalf of Matthew Williams (Michel, Alix) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Alix Michel on behalf of McKenzie Miller (Michel, Alix) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#18

(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paige Post. Charles Haney served on 9/4/2019. (Dupree, Charles) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#17

(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paige Post. Tony Parsons served on 9/4/2019. (Dupree, Charles) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#4

(#22) NOTICE by McMinn County, Tennessee re #4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss That the Parties Are Conferring (Michel, Alix) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

1 #8

Summons McMinn County Summons

1 #7

Summons Guy Sunmmons

1 #6

Summons Parsons summons

1 #5

Summons Haney Summons

1 #4

Summons Williams summons

1 #3

Summons Miller summons

1 #2

Summons Hampton summons

1 #1

Other civil cover sheet

#1

(#6) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, by Paige Post. (Attachments: #1 Summons McMinn County Summons, #2 Summons Guy summons, #3 Summons Hampton summons, #4 Summons haney summons, #5 Summons Miller summons, #6 Summons Parsons summons, #7 Summons williams summons)(Dupree, Charles) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Paige Post.(Dupree, Charles) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Alix Michel on behalf of Boo Alan Hampton (Michel, Alix) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE by McMinn County, Tennessee re #4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss That the Parties Are Conferring (Michel, Alix) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Alix Michel on behalf of Charles Haney (Michel, Alix) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Alix Michel on behalf of Matthew Williams (Michel, Alix) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Alix Michel on behalf of McKenzie Miller (Michel, Alix) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paige Post. Charles Haney served on 9/4/2019. (Dupree, Charles) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paige Post. Tony Parsons served on 9/4/2019. (Dupree, Charles) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paige Post. Joe Guy served on 9/4/2019. (Dupree, Charles) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paige Post. Matthew Williams served on 9/4/2019. (Dupree, Charles) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Alix Michel on behalf of McMinn County, Tennessee (Michel, Alix) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Boo Alan Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Charles Haney, #2 Summons Issued as to Joe Guy, #3 Summons Issued as to Matthew Williams, #4 Summons Issued as to McKenzie Miller, #5 Summons Issued as to McMinn County, #6 Summons Issued as to Toby Parsons)(AML) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Administrative Notice to Counsel re #6 Supplement : Informational for future filings. (AML) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, by Paige Post. (Attachments: #1 Summons McMinn County Summons, #2 Summons Guy summons, #3 Summons Hampton summons, #4 Summons haney summons, #5 Summons Miller summons, #6 Summons Parsons summons, #7 Summons williams summons)(Dupree, Charles) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/19/19. (AWS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/19/19. (AWS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/19/19. (AWS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Charles Dupree re #1 Complaint: requirements due by 8/26/2019. (AWS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AWS) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4051965.), filed by Paige Post. (Attachments: #1 Other civil cover sheet, #2 Summons Hampton summons, #3 Summons Miller summons, #4 Summons Williams summons, #5 Summons Haney Summons, #6 Summons Parsons summons, #7 Summons Guy Sunmmons, #8 Summons McMinn County Summons)(Dupree, Charles) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less