This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2022 at 09:47:38 (UTC).

Positerry v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 Positerry filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02490

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lloyd Positerry, II

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Betsy J. Barnes

Attorney at Morris Bart, LLC

601 Poydras Street, 24Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70130

Richard Lee Root

Attorney at Morris Bart. LLC

601 Poydras Street, 24Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70130

John C. Enochs

Attorney at Morris Bart, P.L.C.

601 Poydras Street, 24Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorney

Jennise Walker-Stubbs

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (jeg) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2741. (cwa) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Transmittal Letter

6 #6

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

6 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Lloyd PositerryII] byMonsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/31/2022) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Lloyd Positerry II] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/31/2022) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Lloyd Positerry II] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/31/2022) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Lloyd Positerry II] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/31/2022) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Lloyd Positerry II] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/31/2022) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Lloyd PositerryII] byMonsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 5/31/2022) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED: Louisiana Eastern, 2:22cv00839, Positerry v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-02490-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 326 cc: JPMDL (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2022) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00839. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order of MDL Transfer to District of Northern District of California. MDL case number is 2741. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(cwa) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2741. (cwa) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (jeg) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9296658) filed by Lloyd Positerry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney John C. Enochs added to party Lloyd Positerry, II(pty:pla).(Enochs, John) Modified ttext on 4/1/2022 (jeg). (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Monsanto Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennise Walker-Stubbs