This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2020 at 09:03:53 (UTC).

Posey v. DirecManagement, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Posey filed an Other lawsuit against DirecManagement, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. Bradley Murray. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00477

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. Bradley Murray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larry Posey

Defendant

DirecManagement, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mary E. Philipps

Attorney at Philipps & Philipps, Ltd.

9760 S. Roberts Road Suite 1

Palos Hills, IL 60465

David J. Philipps

Attorney at Philipps & Philipps, Ltd

9760 S Roberts Road, Suite 1

Palos Hills, IL 60465-1629

Bradford W. Botes

Attorney at Bond, Botes, Reese & Shinn, P.C.

15 Southlake Lane, Suite 140

Birmingham, AL 35244

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#6

#5

#4

3 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

3 #1

Certificate of Service

#3

2 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

2 #1

Certificate of Service

#2

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Order entered that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear his or its own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/5/2020. (eec) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Larry Posey (Philipps, David) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Settlement by Larry Posey (Philipps, David) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Mary E. Philipps. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/28/20. (lto) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by David J. Philipps. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/28/20. (lto) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION and APPLICATION for David J. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice. #3 MOTION and APPLICATION for Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (eec) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to DirecManagement, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P Bradley Murray for trial. (eec) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford W. Botes on behalf of Larry Posey (Botes, Bradford) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION and APPLICATION for Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2683280, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Larry Posey. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Philipps, Mary) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION and APPLICATION for David J. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2683259, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Larry Posey. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Philipps, David) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DirecManagement, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2683253, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Larry Posey. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 12/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons) (Philipps, David) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradford Wayne Botes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary E. Philipps