This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/15/2021 at 08:45:26 (UTC).

Portsmith Owners Association v. The Hanover American Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 Portsmith Owners Association filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Hanover American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00817

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portsmith Owners Association

Defendants

The Hanover American Insurance Company

Doe Insurance Companies 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cortney Feniello

Attorney at STEIN SUDWEEKS & STEIN, PLLC

2701 First Ave Ste 430

Seattle, WA 98121

Daniel Stein

Attorney at STEIN SUDWEEKS & STEIN, PLLC

2701 First Ave Ste 430

Seattle, WA 98121

Justin D Sudweeks

Attorney at STEIN SUDWEEKS & STEIN, PLLC

2701 First Ave Ste 430

Seattle, WA 98121

Jerry H. Stein

Attorney at STEIN SUDWEEKS & STEIN, PLLC

2701 First Ave Ste 430

Seattle, WA 98121

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Portsmith Owners Association (Stein, Daniel) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant The Hanover American Insurance Company. (RE) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Portsmith Owners Association must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/24/2021. (RE) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketJudge Richard A. Jones added. (RE) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-00395, by Plaintiff Portsmith Owners Association. (Stein, Daniel) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7129334), filed by Portsmith Owners Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stein, Daniel) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less