This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/18/2022 at 07:06:17 (UTC).

Portia Mason v. The Nickoloff Companies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 Portia Mason filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against The Nickoloff Companies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fred W. Slaughter and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-01924

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fred W. Slaughter

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portia Mason

Defendants

The Nickoloff Companies, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Nick's Restaurants

Does 1 to 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Binyamin I Manoucheri

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm PC

3055 Wislhire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Thiago Merlini Coelho

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorneys

Colin Patrick Calvert

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips LLP

2050 Main Street Suite 1000

Irvine, CA 92614

Kyley Chelwick

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips LLP

2050 Main Street Suite 1000

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Colin Patrick Calvert counsel for Defendant The Nickoloff Companies, Inc.. Adding Colin P. Calvert as counsel of record for The Nickoloff Companies, Inc. dba Nick's Restaurants for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Nickoloff Companies, Inc. dba Nick's Restaurants. (Attorney Colin Patrick Calvert added to party The Nickoloff Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Calvert, Colin) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION #15 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter, The Court's Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution dated November 23, 2022 #12 , is DISCHARGED. (jp) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

15 #3

Proposed Order

15 #2

Exhibit 1

15 #1

Declaration of Binyamin I. Manoucheri in Support of Plaintiff's Response to

#15

(#15) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Portia Masonto Order to Show Cause, #12 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Binyamin I. Manoucheri in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Court's Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Manoucheri, Binyamin) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) AND STIPULATION TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT #13 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Having considered and reviewed Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by not More than 30 Days (L.R. 8-3) and Stipulation to File an Amended Complaint #13 (the Stipulation), and good cause appearing, the court hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS the following: 1. The time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned matter is EXTENDED to and includingDecember 21, 2022. 2. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to amend the Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rolm) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Nickoloff Companies, Inc. answer now due 12/21/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Nickoloff Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Kyley Chelwick added to party The Nickoloff Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chelwick, Kyley) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#12

(#12) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than 11/30/2022, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further information). (jp) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Portia Mason, upon Defendant The Nickoloff Companies, Inc. served on 10/31/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Haley Cox, Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Manoucheri, Binyamin) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

#10

(#10) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Nickoloff Companies, Inc.. (sh) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (sh) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to John D. Early. New Case Number 8:22-cv-01924 FWS (JDEx). (sh) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34183126 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason. (Attorney Binyamin I Manoucheri added to party Portia Mason(pty:pla))(Manoucheri, Binyamin) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Colin Patrick Calvert counsel for Defendant The Nickoloff Companies, Inc.. Adding Colin P. Calvert as counsel of record for The Nickoloff Companies, Inc. dba Nick's Restaurants for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Nickoloff Companies, Inc. dba Nick's Restaurants. (Attorney Colin Patrick Calvert added to party The Nickoloff Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Calvert, Colin) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION #15 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter, The Court's Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution dated November 23, 2022 #12 , is DISCHARGED. (jp) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Portia Masonto Order to Show Cause, #12 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Binyamin I. Manoucheri in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Court's Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Manoucheri, Binyamin) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3) AND STIPULATION TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT #13 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Having considered and reviewed Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by not More than 30 Days (L.R. 8-3) and Stipulation to File an Amended Complaint #13 (the Stipulation), and good cause appearing, the court hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS the following: 1. The time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned matter is EXTENDED to and includingDecember 21, 2022. 2. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to amend the Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rolm) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Nickoloff Companies, Inc. answer now due 12/21/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Nickoloff Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Kyley Chelwick added to party The Nickoloff Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chelwick, Kyley) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than 11/30/2022, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further information). (jp) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Portia Mason, upon Defendant The Nickoloff Companies, Inc. served on 10/31/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Haley Cox, Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Manoucheri, Binyamin) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Nickoloff Companies, Inc.. (sh) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (sh) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to John D. Early. New Case Number 8:22-cv-01924 FWS (JDEx). (sh) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason. (Manoucheri, Binyamin) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason, (Manoucheri, Binyamin) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason. (Manoucheri, Binyamin) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34183126 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Portia Mason. (Attorney Binyamin I Manoucheri added to party Portia Mason(pty:pla))(Manoucheri, Binyamin) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less