This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2021 at 10:45:49 (UTC).

PORTERICKER v. RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 PORTERICKER filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Sweeney II and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02120

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LORENA PORTERICKER

Defendant

RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC doing business as IMC CREDIT SERVICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas E. Irons

Attorney at SAWIN & SHEA, LLC

6100 N. Keystone Avenue, Suite 620

Indianapolis, IN 46220

Richard John Shea, Jr.

Attorney at SAWIN & SHEA, LLC

6100 North Keystone Ave., Suite 620

Indianapolis, IN 46220

Anthony P. Chester

Attorney at KAZEROUNI LAW GROUP, APC

120 S. 6Th Street, Suite 2050

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorney

Nicholas Ward Levi

Attorney at KIGHTLINGER & GRAY, LLP (Indianapolis)

211 North Pennsylvania Street

One Indiana Square, SUIT 300

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - This case is assigned for a telephonic initial pretrial conference before United States Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on October 14, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. (Eastern Time). Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties shall file the proposed CMP no less than three days prior to the pretrial conference. *SEE ORDER*. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/24/2021.(MGG) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent RMP GROUP, INC. for RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC.. (Levi, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Ward Levi on behalf of Defendant RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC. (Levi, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony P. Chester on behalf of Plaintiff LORENA PORTERICKER. (Chester, Anthony) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#6

(#6) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC. (DJH) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Shea, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff LORENA PORTERICKER. (Shea, Richard) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

1 #8

Proposed Summons

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's June 15, 2021 Trans Union Credit

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's June 15, 2021 Experian Credit Rep

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's September 24, 2020 Experian Credi

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - The Facsimile Transmission of the November 27, 2019 letter sent by P

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - The November 27, 2019, letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC, filed by LORENA PORTERICKER. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6675159) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - The November 27, 2019, letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - The Facsimile Transmission of the November 27, 2019 letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel, #4 Exhibit 4 - Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's September 24, 2020 Experian Credit Report, #5 Exhibit 5 - Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's June 15, 2021 Experian Credit Report, #6 Exhibit 6 - Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's June 15, 2021 Trans Union Credit Report, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons)(Shea, Richard) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - This case is assigned for a telephonic initial pretrial conference before United States Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on October 14, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. (Eastern Time). Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties shall file the proposed CMP no less than three days prior to the pretrial conference. *SEE ORDER*. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/24/2021.(MGG) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent RMP GROUP, INC. for RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC.. (Levi, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Ward Levi on behalf of Defendant RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC. (Levi, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony P. Chester on behalf of Plaintiff LORENA PORTERICKER. (Chester, Anthony) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC. (DJH) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Irons on behalf of Plaintiff LORENA PORTERICKER. (Irons, Thomas) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Shea, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff LORENA PORTERICKER. (Shea, Richard) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC, filed by LORENA PORTERICKER. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6675159) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - The November 27, 2019, letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - The Facsimile Transmission of the November 27, 2019 letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel, #4 Exhibit 4 - Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's September 24, 2020 Experian Credit Report, #5 Exhibit 5 - Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's June 15, 2021 Experian Credit Report, #6 Exhibit 6 - Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's June 15, 2021 Trans Union Credit Report, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons)(Shea, Richard) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RECEIVABLES MANAGEMENT PARTNERS, LLC doing business as IMC CREDIT SERVICES is a litigant