This case was last updated from PACER on 03/18/2019 at 07:51:40 (UTC).

PORTER v. WARDEN

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 PORTER filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against WARDEN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00012

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NICHOLAS PORTER

Branchville, IN 47514

Respondent

WARDEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Abigail T. Rom

Attorney at INDIANA ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 West Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South, Fifth Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal with Ex Parte Restrictions - SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/1/2019. (JRB) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Manual Filing, filed by Respondent WARDEN, re #9 MOTION for ExParte Restriction, #8 Return to Order to Show Cause. (Rom, Abigail) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) MOTION for ExParte Restriction, filed by Respondent WARDEN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rom, Abigail) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

8 #11

Exhibit G - List of Offenses

8 #10

Exhibit E - Final Reviewing Authority Letter

8 #9

Exhibit D - Disciplinary Hearing Appeal

8 #8

Exhibit C-1 - Notice of Restrictions

8 #7

Exhibit C - Report of Disciplinary Hearing

8 #6

Exhibit B-4 - Report of Disciplinary Hearing Video Evidence Review

8 #5

Exhibit B-3 - Notice to Lay Advocate

8 #4

Exhibit B-2 - Notice to Lay Advocate

8 #3

Exhibit B-1 - Notice to Lay Advocate

8 #2

Exhibit B - Screening Report

8 #1

Exhibit A - Report of Conduct

#8

(#8) RETURN TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, re #4 Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary), filed by WARDEN.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Report of Conduct, #2 Exhibit B - Screening Report, #3 Exhibit B-1 - Notice to Lay Advocate, #4 Exhibit B-2 - Notice to Lay Advocate, #5 Exhibit B-3 - Notice to Lay Advocate, #6 Exhibit B-4 - Report of Disciplinary Hearing Video Evidence Review, #7 Exhibit C - Report of Disciplinary Hearing, #8 Exhibit C-1 - Notice of Restrictions, #9 Exhibit D - Disciplinary Hearing Appeal, #10 Exhibit E - Final Reviewing Authority Letter, #11 Exhibit G - List of Offenses)(Rom, Abigail) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail T. Rom on behalf of Respondent WARDEN. (Rom, Abigail) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Disciplinary) - Nicholas Porter's petition for a writ of habeas corpus challenges his disciplinary conviction in disciplinary case number BTC 18-11-0118. The petitioner shall have through February 19, 2019, in which to either pay the $5.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate his financial inability to do so The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 2/28/2019.. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/17/2019.(JRB) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of #10 NOTICE of Manual Filing, filed by Respondent WARDEN, re #9 MOTION for ExParte Restriction, #8 Return to Order to Show Cause. (Rom, Abigail) (JRB) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit Under Seal with Ex Parte Restrictions - SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/1/2019. (JRB) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Manual Filing, filed by Respondent WARDEN, re #9 MOTION for ExParte Restriction, #8 Return to Order to Show Cause. (Rom, Abigail) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for ExParte Restriction, filed by Respondent WARDEN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rom, Abigail) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, re #4 Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary), filed by WARDEN.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Report of Conduct, #2 Exhibit B - Screening Report, #3 Exhibit B-1 - Notice to Lay Advocate, #4 Exhibit B-2 - Notice to Lay Advocate, #5 Exhibit B-3 - Notice to Lay Advocate, #6 Exhibit B-4 - Report of Disciplinary Hearing Video Evidence Review, #7 Exhibit C - Report of Disciplinary Hearing, #8 Exhibit C-1 - Notice of Restrictions, #9 Exhibit D - Disciplinary Hearing Appeal, #10 Exhibit E - Final Reviewing Authority Letter, #11 Exhibit G - List of Offenses)(Rom, Abigail) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail T. Rom on behalf of Respondent WARDEN. (Rom, Abigail) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/24/2019. (JRB) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Petitioner NICHOLAS PORTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JRB) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Disciplinary) - Nicholas Porter's petition for a writ of habeas corpus challenges his disciplinary conviction in disciplinary case number BTC 18-11-0118. The petitioner shall have through February 19, 2019, in which to either pay the $5.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate his financial inability to do so The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 2/28/2019.. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/17/2019.(JRB) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by NICHOLAS PORTER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Disciplinary documents)(REO) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by NICHOLAS PORTER located at BRANCHVILLE CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by NICHOLAS PORTER to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (REO) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARDEN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abigail T. Rom