This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 10:53:47 (UTC).

Porter v. Carter et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 Porter filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Carter. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy Percy and Debra M. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00049

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy Percy

Presiding Judge

Debra M. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carl Porter

Defendants

Victoria Eckford

Gloria Carter

Angela Brown

Honeycut

Dr. Tony Carswello

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Carl Porter for July 16, 2019. (rtc)

#10

(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #8 Order, Set Hearings. (cr)

#9

(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cr)

#8

(#8) ORDER - Spears Hearing set for 7/16/2019 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/23/19. (cr)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/23/19. (cr)

#6

(#6) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Carl Porter. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (cr) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#5

(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT AND CERTIFICATION TO CONTINUE LAWSUIT. (cr) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 5/4/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/4/19. (cr)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M. Brown and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (cr)

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement filed by Carl Porter. (cr)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Carl Porter for July 16, 2019. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #8 Order, Set Hearings. (cr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (cr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER - Spears Hearing set for 7/16/2019 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/23/19. (cr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/23/19. (cr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Carl Porter. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (cr) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT AND CERTIFICATION TO CONTINUE LAWSUIT. (cr) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 5/4/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/4/19. (cr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M. Brown and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (cr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carl Porter. (cr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement filed by Carl Porter. (cr)

    Read MoreRead Less