This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2021 at 10:43:33 (UTC).

PORRAZ v. KIA MOTORS MANUFACTURING GEORGIA INC

Case Summary

On September 13, 2021, Hope Elizabeth Porraz, formerly known as Hope Judd Landrum (“Plaintiff”), represented by Barbara H. Agricola of Agricola Law, LLC, filed an employment lawsuit against Kia Motors Manufacturing Georgia, Inc. (“KMMG”), seeking compensatory damages along with prejudgement interest among other relief for the alleged hostile work environment and sexual harassment against the plaintiff. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the Middle District of Georgia with Judge Clay D. Land presiding. 

In the complaint, the plaintiff alleged that she, “was subjected to unwelcome sexual harassment at the hands of KMMG Procurement Department HOD Kevin Kinsey through offensive remarks about her body, her clothing, and his future sex life after prostate surgery. The sexual harassment Plaintiff suffered was based on her female sex.”

Plaintiff then alleged that, “KMMG Procurement Department HOD Kevin Kinsey’s sexual harassment of Plaintiff and bias against Plaintiff because she is female was manifested by his initial decision not to credit Plaintiff’s prior relevant experience when KMMG adopted the career banding review process in December, 2014, resulting in Plaintiff’s placement in career band level 2, instead of career band level 3, where she would have been placed had such experience been properly credited to her.”

Plaintiff further alleged that, “Following Plaintiff’s complaints to HR and TR between April and September, 2020, KMMG failed to take appropriate corrective and remedial measures to prevent HOD Kevin Kinsey’s continuing sexual harassment and bias against Plaintiff” and “[f]urther, as a direct result of Plaintiff’s rebuke of HOD Kevin Kinsey for his sexually inappropriate comments and advances, Plaintiff suffered adverse employment actions in that Plaintiff did not receive promotions and salary increases when she should have received them and the amounts of her salary increases were lower than her continuously improving performance appraisals and her zealous participation in extra training and extra teams indicated she should have received.”

Plaintiff also alleged that, “Finally, Plaintiff was constructively discharged and forced to resign her employment with KMMG because of the sexual harassment she suffered which KMMG failed to take appropriate steps to remedy or eliminate from the workplace even after Plaintiff complained to HR about HOD Kevin Kinsey’s sexually harassing conduct and sexual bias against her because she is female.”

There are two claims of relief laid down by the plaintiff. The first claim is for the alleged hostile work environment sexual harassment. The second claim is for the Title VII Retaliation.

In its prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested the court for a judgement that states that Defendant engaged in unlawful retaliation and/or discrimination against Plaintiff in violation of 42 U.S.C. § 2000e, et seq. Further, Plaintiff requested the court for awarding back-pay during all periods of employment from August 12, 2013, to the date of judgment in this case, including the value of all fringe benefits, as awardable by virtue of 42 U.S.C. § 2000e-5 and front-pay beginning at the date of judgment and continuing until such time as Plaintiff can be expected to attain comparable or equivalent remunerative employment. Plaintiff also requested the court for compensatory damages, punitive or exemplary damages, reasonable attorneys’ fees, and costs and any other relief the court deems appropriate.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00156

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY D LAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hope Elizabeth Porraz

HOPE JUDD LANDRUM

Defendant

KIA MOTORS MANUFACTURING GEORGIA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARBARA H AGRICOLA

Attorney at AGRICOLA LAW, LLC

127 S 8Th St

Opelika, AL 36801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to KIA MOTORS MANUFACTURING GEORGIA INC. (esl) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HOPE ELIZABETH PORRAZ as to KIA MOTORS MANUFACTURING GEORGIA INC. (AGRICOLA, BARBARA) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HOPE ELIZABETH PORRAZ as to KIA MOTORS MANUFACTURING GEORGIA INC. (AGRICOLA, BARBARA) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to KIA MOTORS MANUFACTURING GEORGIA INC. (esl) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by HOPE ELIZABETH PORRAZ ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(esl) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against KIA MOTORS MANUFACTURING GEORGIA INC Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3895548, $402 filed by Hope Elizabeth Porraz (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(AGRICOLA, BARBARA) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less