This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2022 at 08:48:39 (UTC).

POPOLA et al v. AMAZON.COM, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 POPOLA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMAZON COM, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Freda L. Wolfson, Douglas E. Arpert and Rukhsanah L. Singh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-03354

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

Referral Judges

Douglas E. Arpert

Rukhsanah L. Singh

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANTONIO POPOLA

ERIN POPOLA

Defendants

AMAZON.COM, INC.

AMAZON.COM, LLC

AMAZON.COM

AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC

AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.

AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER

AMAZON DELIVERY PARTNERS, INC.

AMAZON SERVICES, LLC

AMAZON LOGISTICS

ERIN GODFREY-RICHARDSON

EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

TL TRANSPORTATION, LLC

"JOHN DOES 1-2"

"ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5"

"DEF CORPORATIONS 1-5"

AMAZON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES M. CURRAN

86 Washington Avenue

Milltown, NJ 08850

Defendant Attorneys

CRYSTAL ELAINE DOZIER

Attorney at LAW FFICE OF CRYSTAL E. DOZIER

640 Colonial Ave

Union, NJ 07083

FELICE J. COTIGNOLA

Attorney at LESTER SCHWAB KATZ & DWYER

120 Broadway

New York, NY 10271

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Amended Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON DELIVERY PARTNERS, INC., AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER, AMAZON LOGISTICS, AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, ERIN GODFREY-RICHARDSON, TL TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (DOZIER, CRYSTAL) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON DELIVERY PARTNERS, INC., AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER, AMAZON LOGISTICS, AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, ERIN GODFREY-RICHARDSON, TL TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (DOZIER, CRYSTAL) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON DELIVERY PARTNERS, INC., AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER, AMAZON LOGISTICS, AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, ERIN GODFREY-RICHARDSON, TL TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (DOZIER, CRYSTAL) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosures for AMAZON, EAN HOLDINGS AND TL TRANSPORATION on June 3, 2022, filed by AMAZON, AMAZON DELIVERY PARTNERS, INC., AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER, AMAZON LOGISTICS, AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, ERIN GODFREY-RICHARDSON, TL TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (DOZIER, CRYSTAL) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Service - Notice of Appearance

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosures for AMAZON, EAN HOLDINGS AND TL TRANSPORATION on June 3, 2022, filed by AMAZON, AMAZON DELIVERY PARTNERS, INC., AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER, AMAZON LOGISTICS, AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, ERIN GODFREY-RICHARDSON, TL TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (DOZIER, CRYSTAL) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2022 at 2:30 PM in person before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 7/1/2022. (jal, ) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2022 at 2:30 PM in person before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 7/1/2022. (jal, ) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert no longer assigned to case. (dm ) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosures for AMAZON, EAN HOLDINGS AND TL TRANSPORATION on June 3, 2022, filed by AMAZON, AMAZON DELIVERY PARTNERS, INC., AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER, AMAZON LOGISTICS, AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, ERIN GODFREY-RICHARDSON, TL TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (DOZIER, CRYSTAL) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Affidavit of Service #5 submitted by Crystal Dozier on 6/3/2022 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jdg) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by FELICE J. COTIGNOLA on behalf of AMAZON, AMAZON DELIVERY PARTNERS, INC., AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER, AMAZON LOGISTICS, AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, ERIN GODFREY-RICHARDSON, TL TRANSPORTATION, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Service - Notice of Appearance)(COTIGNOLA, FELICE) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by FELICE J. COTIGNOLA on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Service - Notice of Appearance)(COTIGNOLA, FELICE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosures for AMAZON, EAN HOLDINGS AND TL TRANSPORATION on June 3, 2022, filed by AMAZON, AMAZON DELIVERY PARTNERS, INC., AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER, AMAZON LOGISTICS, AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, ERIN GODFREY-RICHARDSON, TL TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (DOZIER, CRYSTAL) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Removal #1 submitted by Crystal E. Dozier on 6/1/22 attorney's address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (kht) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (kht) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (kht) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON DELIVERY PARTNERS, INC., AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER, AMAZON LOGISTICS, AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, ERIN GODFREY-RICHARDSON, TL TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (DOZIER, CRYSTAL) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON DELIVERY PARTNERS, INC., AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER, AMAZON LOGISTICS, AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, ERIN GODFREY-RICHARDSON, TL TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (DOZIER, CRYSTAL) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON DELIVERY PARTNERS, INC., AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER, AMAZON LOGISTICS, AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON.COM, LLC, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, ERIN GODFREY-RICHARDSON, TL TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (DOZIER, CRYSTAL) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON LOGISTICS, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON DELIVERY PARTNERS, INC., ERIN GODFREY-RICHARDSON, TL TRANSPORTATION, LLC, AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER, AMAZON.COM, LLC, AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM from Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County, case number MID-L-000303-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13452535), filed by AMAZON LOGISTICS, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM, INC., AMAZON DELIVERY PARTNERS, INC., ERIN GODFREY-RICHARDSON, TL TRANSPORTATION, LLC, AMAZON FULFILLMENT CENTER, AMAZON.COM, LLC, AMAZON SERVICES, LLC, AMAZON.COM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DOZIER, CRYSTAL) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TL TRANSPORTATION, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DEF CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon Fulfillment Center is a litigant