This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/30/2021 at 06:52:50 (UTC).

POPA v. HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 04/19/2019 POPA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Peter J. Phipps and William S. Stickman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00450

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Peter J. Phipps

William S. Stickman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASHLEY POPA

Defendants

HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC.

NAVISTONE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary F. Lynch

Attorney at Carlson Lynch, LLP

1133 Penn Avenue, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Kelly K. Iverson

Attorney at Carlson Lynch, LLP

1133 Penn Avenue, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Elizabeth Pollock-Avery

Attorney at Carlson Lynch, LLP

1133 Penn Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Defendant Attorneys

Emily B. Thomas

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

2929 Arch Street, Cira Centre, 12Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19104-2891

Carrie H. Dettmer Slye

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

312 Walnut Street, Suite 3200

Cincinnti, OH 45202

Paul G. Karlsgodt

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1801 California Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Rachel R. Hadrick

Attorney at McNees Wallace & Nurick LLC

100 Pine Street, Po Box 1166

Harrisburg, PA 17108-1166

Eamonn Hart

Attorney at Brann & Isaacson

184 Maine St, Po Box 3070

Lewiston, ME 04243

Devin J. Chwastyk

Attorney at McNees Wallace & Nurick LLC

100 Pine Street, Po Box 1166

Harrisburg, PA 17102

David Swetnam-Burland

Attorney at Brann & Isaacson

Po Box 3070, 184 Main Street, 4Th Floor

Lewiston, ME 04243-3070

David W. Bertoni

Attorney at Brann & Isaacson

184 Main Street, P.O. Box 3070

Lewiston, ME 04243-3070

Devin Chwastyk

Attorney at McNees Wallace & Nurick LLC

100 Pine St

Harrisburg, PA 17101-1166

 

Court Documents

#120

RESTRICTED

#119

#118

#117

#116

#115

91 #1

Proposed Order

#91

#5

#4

#3

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

174 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) USCA Case Number 21-2203 for #119 Notice of Appeal,, filed by ASHLEY POPA. USCA Case Manager Tim McIntyre (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (tmm3) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #117 Order, #116 Memorandum Opinion, #118 Rule 58 Judgment by ASHLEY POPA. Filing fee $505, receipt number APAWDC-6575218. Motion for IFP N/A. Certificate of Appealability N/A. Court Reporter(s): Jane Proud. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (Iverson, Kelly) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Harriet Carter Gifts, Inc. and Navistone, Inc. and against Plaintiff Ashley Popa. The Clerk of Court shall mark this CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 06/17/21. (eca) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) ORDER GRANTING #91 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 06/17/21. (eca) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) OPINION on summary judgment. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 06/17/21. (eca) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) BRIEF in Opposition re #87 Motion for Summary Judgment, Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief per ECF 112 filed by ASHLEY POPA. (Iverson, Kelly) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) BRIEF in Support re #87 Motion for Summary Judgment, Defendants' Supplemental Brief per ECF 112 filed by HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC., NAVISTONE, INC.. (Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re hearing held on 04-14-21 before Judge William S. Stickman, IV. Court Reporter Jane Proud, Telephone number 216-415-4315. Tape Number: janeproud8@gmail.com. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 4/30/2021. Redaction Request due 5/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2021. (jmp) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Stickman: Videoconference Oral Argument held on 4/14/2021. (Court Reporter: Jane Proud) (eca) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) ORDER SCHEDULING ORAL ARGUMENT. Videoconference Oral Argument set for 4/14/2021 at 1:30 PM before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 01/29/21. (eca) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for attorney Eamonn Hart to Appear Pro Hac Vice, On Behalf of NaviStone, Inc. (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5110968) by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Eamonn Hart Bar Status, #3 Exhibit Eamonn Hart Certificate of Good Standing) (Hart, Eamonn) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Hadrick, Rachel) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for attorney Devin J. Chwastyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5110856) by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Devin J. Chwastyk in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit) (Chwastyk, Devin) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC. Answer due from HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC. on 5/29/2019. (Thomas, Emily) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by NAVISTONE, INC. Answer due from NAVISTONE, INC. on 5/29/2019. (Hadrick, Rachel) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for attorney David Swetnam-Burland to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5110268) by NAVISTONE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Swetnam-Burland, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit of David Swetnam-Burland, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit of David Swetnam-Burland) (Swetnam-Burland, David) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC.. (Thomas, Emily) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily B. Thomas on behalf of HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC.. (Thomas, Emily) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Docket(#2) ORDER OF COURT. By May 13, 2019, each party must execute and file the judge election form, available at https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Through that filing, each party must either consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge or select the option to proceed before a United States District Judge. If all parties consent to have the case assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge, the matter will be referred to the Clerk of Court for reassignment. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 04/22/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Court of Common Pleas of Lawrence County, case number 10248-19 with Jury Demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5105595) filed by NAVISTONE, INC., HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (cel) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NAVISTONE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIET CARTER GIFTS, INC. is a litigant