This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2022 at 03:19:08 (UTC).

POP TOP CORP. v. Amazon.Com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 POP TOP CORP filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Amazon Com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia K. DeMarchi and Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00112

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Virginia K. DeMarchi

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pop Top Corp

Defendant

Amazon.com, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew M. Wawrzyn

Attorney at WAWRZYN & Jarvis LLC

233 S. Wacker Dr., 84Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Matthew Michael Wawrzyn

Attorney at Wawrzyn LLC

200 East Randolph Street, Suite 5100

Chicago, IL 60601

Henry Artoush Ohanian

Attorney at OhanianIP

604 West 13Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel T Shvodian

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - Palo Alto

3150 Porter Drive

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Kevin A. Zeck

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1201 3Rd Avenue, Suite 4900

Seattle, WA 98101

M. Craig Tyler

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

500 W. 2Nd Street, Suite 1900

Austin, TX 78701

W. Matthew Pierce

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1900 Sixteenth Street, Suite 1400

Denver, CO 80202

Daniel Thomas Shvodian

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

3150 Porter Drive

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1212

 

Court Documents

#43

(#43) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/28/22. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2022 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 8583698The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2022) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

42 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

42 #42

Main Document

#40

(#40) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Shvodian, Daniel) (Filed on 1/27/2022) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#39

(#39) Certificate of Interested Entities by Amazon.com, Inc (Shvodian, Daniel) (Filed on 1/27/2022) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#38

(#38) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pop Top Corp.. (Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Filed on 1/27/2022) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#37

(#37) CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that an Initial Case Management Conference has been set for 3/30/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement by no later than 3/23/2022. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting o f court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2022) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#36

(#36) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for all further proceedings re #35 Notice of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 1/20/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2022) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Amazon.com, Inc (Shvodian, Daniel) (Filed on 1/19/2022) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Craig Tyler on behalf of Amazon.Com, Inc.. Attorney M. Craig Tyler added to party Amazon.Com, Inc.(pty:dft) (Tyler, M.) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Amazon.Com, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ohanian, Henry) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/31/2021) (lad). (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by POP TOP CORP.. (Ohanian, Henry) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/31/2021) (lad). (Entered: 03/31/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit B - U.S. Pat. No. 10,866,713

1 #2

Exhibit A - U.S. Pat. No. 7,966,623

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

114 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/28/22. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2022 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852Access Code: 8583698The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2022) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 1/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2022) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • Docket(#41) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2022) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Shvodian, Daniel) (Filed on 1/27/2022) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Certificate of Interested Entities by Amazon.com, Inc (Shvodian, Daniel) (Filed on 1/27/2022) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pop Top Corp.. (Wawrzyn, Matthew) (Filed on 1/27/2022) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that an Initial Case Management Conference has been set for 3/30/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement by no later than 3/23/2022. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting o f court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2022) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for all further proceedings re #35 Notice of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 1/20/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2022) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Amazon.com, Inc (Shvodian, Daniel) (Filed on 1/19/2022) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docket(#34) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by POP TOP CORP.. (Ohanian, Henry) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Tyler, M.) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tyler, M.) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Craig Tyler on behalf of Amazon.Com, Inc.. Attorney M. Craig Tyler added to party Amazon.Com, Inc.(pty:dft) (Tyler, M.) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Amazon.Com, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ohanian, Henry) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/31/2021) (lad). (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by POP TOP CORP.. (Ohanian, Henry) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/31/2021) (lad). (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14649147), filed by POP TOP CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - U.S. Pat. No. 7,966,623, #3 Exhibit B - U.S. Pat. No. 10,866,713)(Ohanian, Henry) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/31/2021) (lad). (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin A. Zeck

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel T. Shvodian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer M. Craig Tyler