This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/17/2021 at 09:00:03 (UTC).

Pooler v. G&D Integrated Inc

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 Pooler filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against G D Integrated Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C Norton and Kevin McDonald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00773

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Norton

Referral Judge

Kevin McDonald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Pooler

Defendant

G&D Integrated Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Daniel Dickey, Jr

Attorney at Dickey Law Group LLC

440 Center Street

West Columbia, SC 29169

Defendant Attorney

Cara Y Crotty

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith and Prophete LLP

Po Box 11297

Columbia, SC 29211-1297

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 4/20/2021. (kric, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#16

(#16) AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/17/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/16/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/16/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/8/2021, Discovery due by 10/21/2021, Motions due by 11/22/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/21/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 2/21/2022, ADR Statement due by 10/7/2021, Mediation Due by 11/5/2021. The parties should note that the amended scheduling order contains several dates that are different than those proposed by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 4/20/2021. (kric, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#15

(#15) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert Pooler.(Dickey, Joseph) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

14 #2

Redlined Version of Confidentiality Order

14 #1

Proposed Order - Confidentiality Order

#14

(#14) Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by G&D Integrated Inc., Robert Pooler. Response to Motion due by 5/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - Confidentiality Order, #2 Redlined Version of Confidentiality Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Crotty, Cara) Modified on 4/20/2021 to edit filers and text (kric, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#13

(#13) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by G&D Integrated Inc.(Crotty, Cara) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#12

(#12) Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by G&D Integrated Inc., Robert Pooler (Crotty, Cara) Modified on 4/20/2021 to edit filers and text (kric, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by G&D Integrated Inc., Robert Pooler (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crotty, Cara) Modified on 4/20/2021 to edit filers and text (kric, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#10

(#10) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert Pooler.(Dickey, Joseph) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#9

(#9) MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 8/25/2021, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/18/2021. (kric, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

8 #4

Exhibit D - Certified Mail Return Receipts - Cohen & Braskich

8 #3

Exhibit C - Certified Mailer to Registered Agent/USPS Tracking

8 #2

Exhibit B - 02/09/2021 email from Keith Braskich, Esq.

8 #1

Exhibit A - SC Secretary of State Business Entity Search

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Joseph D. Dickey, Jr., Esq. - Proof of Service of Amended Complaint by Robert Pooler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SC Secretary of State Business Entity Search, #2 Exhibit B - 02/09/2021 email from Keith Braskich, Esq., #3 Exhibit C - Certified Mailer to Registered Agent/USPS Tracking, #4 Exhibit D - Certified Mail Return Receipts - Cohen & Braskich)(Dickey, Joseph) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/7/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/21/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 4/21/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/17/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/16/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/16/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/9/2021, Discovery due by 7/23/2021, Motions due by 8/9/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/9/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 9/8/2021, ADR Statement due by 7/9/2021, Mediation Due by 8/25/2021, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/18/2021. (kric, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 4/20/2021. (kric, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 4/20/2021.(kric, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/17/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/16/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/16/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/8/2021, Discovery due by 10/21/2021, Motions due by 11/22/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/21/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 2/21/2022, ADR Statement due by 10/7/2021, Mediation Due by 11/5/2021. The parties should note that the amended scheduling order contains several dates that are different than those proposed by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 4/20/2021. (kric, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert Pooler.(Dickey, Joseph) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by G&D Integrated Inc., Robert Pooler. Response to Motion due by 5/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - Confidentiality Order, #2 Redlined Version of Confidentiality Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Crotty, Cara) Modified on 4/20/2021 to edit filers and text (kric, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by G&D Integrated Inc.(Crotty, Cara) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by G&D Integrated Inc., Robert Pooler (Crotty, Cara) Modified on 4/20/2021 to edit filers and text (kric, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by G&D Integrated Inc., Robert Pooler (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crotty, Cara) Modified on 4/20/2021 to edit filers and text (kric, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert Pooler.(Dickey, Joseph) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 8/25/2021, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/18/2021. (kric, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Joseph D. Dickey, Jr., Esq. - Proof of Service of Amended Complaint by Robert Pooler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SC Secretary of State Business Entity Search, #2 Exhibit B - 02/09/2021 email from Keith Braskich, Esq., #3 Exhibit C - Certified Mailer to Registered Agent/USPS Tracking, #4 Exhibit D - Certified Mail Return Receipts - Cohen & Braskich)(Dickey, Joseph) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/7/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/21/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 4/21/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/17/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/16/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/16/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/9/2021, Discovery due by 7/23/2021, Motions due by 8/9/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/9/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 9/8/2021, ADR Statement due by 7/9/2021, Mediation Due by 8/25/2021, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/18/2021. (kric, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE. Plaintiff's LR26.01 interrogatories due within 14 days of filing of notice of removal. (kric, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by G&D Integrated Inc. (kric, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by G&D Integrated Inc.(kric, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-10-05005. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9716712), filed by G&D Integrated Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kric, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cara Y Crotty